California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:20-cv-01664
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2020
Terminated:Oct 15, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 28, 2021 12:50 AM PST
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Padama
Jones Day
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Tom Hanrahan
Represented By
Thomas P Hanrahan
Tphanrahan Dispute Solutions
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Gengler
Represented By
Michael Frederick Cardoza
The Cardoza Law Corporation
contact info
Pamela Erin Prescott
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Lauren B Veggian
The Cardoza Law Corporation
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Ryan Lee McBride
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 27, 2022
37 37 stip Dismiss Case Thu 01/27 6:31 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Daniel Gengler.(Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
36 36 order Staying Case Fri 10/15 11:35 AM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 10/13/2021, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.35 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 12/12/2021. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
35 35 notice Settlement Wed 10/13 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler.(Prescott, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 04, 2021
34 34 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 10/04 3:07 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Doc.28 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2021 (Doc. 28) is CONTINUED to 10/29/2021 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
33 33 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Thu 06/03 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for June 25, 2021.(lst)
Related: [-]
32 32 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Thu 06/03 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Maurice Jacques Attie has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
31 31 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 06/02 4:36 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Maurice J. Attie, Esq. may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 6/25/2021 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler(Prescott, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
30 30 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/24 11:33 AM
DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Stipulation to Allow Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint29 . (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
29 29 stip Amend/Correct Tue 05/11 2:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler.(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redlined FAC,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
28 28 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/04 12:25 PM
ORDER RE: SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES27 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Fact Discovery Cutoff: 6/14/2021. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 6/28/2021. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 8/16/2021. Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): 9/20/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2021 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
27 27 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Tue 04/27 10:53 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler.(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 26, 2021
26 26 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/26 11:13 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date25 : DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
25 25 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Fri 04/16 12:33 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler.(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
24 24 order Protective Order Tue 02/23 10:53 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER23 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott.*Note Changes made by the Court.* (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
23 23 stip Protective Order Mon 02/22 4:56 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Padama, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
22 22 notice Appearance Thu 01/21 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Lee McBride on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Gengler(Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Daniel Gengler(pty:pla))(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 04, 2021
21 21 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Mon 01/04 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Tom Hanrahan has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
20 20 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Thu 12/31 3:38 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Thomas P. Hanrahan may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler(Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
19 19 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 12/10 9:49 AM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 12/10 9:47 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 16, 2021. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 12/10 9:41 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 12/11/2020, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 2/9/2021. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 5/14/2021. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 5/28/2021. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 7/16/2021. Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): 8/20/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
16 16 order Leave to Appear Fri 12/04 2:10 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton DEEMING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY MOOT: The Scheduling Conference in this matter is currently set for December 11, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. PST. If the matter is proceed on calendar, all appearances by counsel will be via Zoom and prior Court approval for virtual appearances will not be required. Counsel shall check the Court's daily calendar and the docket by 4:00pm the day prior to the hearing for more information. (mku)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Fri 12/04 1:04 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Lauren B. Veggian to Appear for Scheduling Conference Telephonically filed by plaintiff Daniel Gengler. (Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 27, 2020
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 11/27 4:36 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan & [Proposed] Order ; estimated length of trial 2-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler..(Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 01, 2020
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 10/01 4:05 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/01 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Padama, Lauren)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/01 3:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Padama added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Padama, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 09/11 7:26 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp - Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/04 1:57 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
8 8 notice Appearance Thu 09/03 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Pamela Erin Prescott on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Gengler(Attorney Pamela Erin Prescott added to party Daniel Gengler(pty:pla))(Prescott, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/03 1:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 09/03 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/03 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/01 8:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler, identifying None. (Cardoza, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 09/01 8:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler. (Cardoza, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 09/01 8:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler. (Cardoza, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/01 8:05 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-27889055 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Gengler. (Attorney Michael Frederick Cardoza added to party Daniel Gengler(pty:pla))(Cardoza, Michael)
Related: [-]