Delaware District Court
Judge:Mary Pat Thynge
Case #: 1:20-cv-01167
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 29, 2022
Case in other court:Connecticut, 3:20-cv-00598
Last checked: Monday Mar 01, 2021 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
LOLA Digital Media, LLC
Represented By
Joseph C. Schoell
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AGH Media Group, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Noonan
contact info
Megan Ix Brison
Pinckney Weidinger Urban & Joyce LLC
contact info
Timothy Butler
contact info
Michael A. Weidinger
Pinckney, Weidinger, Urban, And Joyce LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
82 82 order SO ORDERED 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/29 1:43 PM
SO ORDERED, re81 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Albert G. Hartigan, AGH Media Group, LLC. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/29/2022. (dat)
Related: [-]
81 81 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/29 12:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by AGH Media Group, LLC, Albert G. Hartigan. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, C.