New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:20-cv-12236
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2020
Last checked: Monday Mar 01, 2021 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
ANGELA WOMACK
Represented By
STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Saturday, February 25, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Sat 02/25 12:55 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/03 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC (JAMES, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/03 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 09/09 10:23 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Wed 09/09 10:41 AM
Member Case Direct File on 9/2/2020, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/02 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11298872) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANGELA WOMACK.(RADOS, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet