Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Marcia G Cooke
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:20-cv-23663
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2020
Terminated:Jul 22, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 01, 2021 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,
Represented By
Dirk Matthew Smits
Vernis & Bowling
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By
Nolan Keith Klein
Law Offices Of Nolan Klein, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 08/31 10:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,(Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, July 22, 2021
18 18 order Administrative Order Thu 07/22 8:40 AM
ORDER Administratively Closing Case On Notice Of Settlement. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Mon 07/19 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc., (Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 07/15 4:18 PM
ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date And Pretrial Deadlines: ( Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 2/23/2022 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/29/2021., Fact Discovery due by 11/29/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 7/29/2021., In Limine Motions due by 2/28/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/28/2022., Mediation Deadline 1/28/2022.), Order Referring Case to Mediation. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
15 15 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 12/08 10:36 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jesus Gonzalez(Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/28 10:45 AM
AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,. (Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/19 4:46 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,. (Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 10/13 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc., re11 Response/Reply (Other) filed by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc., (Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response/Reply (Other) Tue 10/13 5:24 PM
Defendant's RESPONSE to8 Statement by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,. (Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 09/30 5:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before October 19, 2020. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/30/2020. (btn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 09/29 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Jesus Gonzalez re8 Statement filed by Jesus Gonzalez (Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement Tue 09/29 10:55 AM
Statement of: Claim by Jesus Gonzalez re5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 09/24 11:09 AM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,. Attorney Dirk Matthew Smits added to party Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,(pty:dft).(Smits, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 09/15 11:24 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc., served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
5 5 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/08 7:36 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 09/08 7:32 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS ORDER ON DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 09/02 3:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,. (ebz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 09/02 3:36 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/02 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Caloosa Cove Resort Owners Association, Inc.,. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13454404, filed by Jesus Gonzalez.(Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet