New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:20-cv-07152
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2sx Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2020
Terminated:Dec 21, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 4:33 AM EST
Defendant
Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc.
Represented By
Scott H. Goldstein
Gallo Vitucci Klar
contact info
Kenneth S. Merber
Gallo Vitucci Klar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark L. Goldsmith
Represented By
Scott H. Goldstein
Gallo Vitucci Klar
contact info
Kenneth S. Merber
Gallo Vitucci Klar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie Li
45 Broadway Suite 430
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Marjorie Mesidor
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Lisa Marie Skruck
Phillips & Associates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
40 40 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/19 3:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff DEBBIE LI, hereby voluntarily dismisses and discontinues all claims against Defendants GETTING OUT AND STAYING OUT, INC. and MARK L. GOLDSMITH, Individually, in the above proceeding with prejudice. Notwithstanding the dismissal of this action in accordance with this agreement, the District Court shall continue to retain jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement reached between the parties. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce their settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record by February 2, 2022. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/19/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
39 39 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 01/18 1:06 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
38 38 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 12/21 3:42 PM
ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that this case has been settled in principle and the parties have executed the settlement agreement. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. Any application to reopen this action must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order, and any application filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and "so ordered" by the Court within the same thirty-day period. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). FURTHER ORDERED that the conference scheduled for December 22, 2021 is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:37 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference in light of settlement addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua Friedman dated December 21, 2021. filed by Debbie Li. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/21/2021) (vfr)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 12/21 1:54 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference in light of settlement addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua Friedman dated December 21, 2021. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 11/01 4:59 PM
ORDER granting35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application granted. A post-discovery conference will be held on December 22, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/1/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/01 5:00 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (va)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11/04 2:02 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 12/21/2021. Expert Discovery due by 12/21/2021. (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
35 35 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/29 3:10 PM
THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Scott Goldstein submitting joint application seeking a brief extension of fact discovery dated 10/29/2021. Document filed by Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith..(Goldstein, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/28 1:33 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith..(Merber, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/19 12:37 PM
ORDER granting30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application granted. The post-discovery conference, currently scheduled for May 21, 2021, is hereby adjourned until August 13, 2021 at 2:00 pm. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 8/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/19/2021) (rj)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/19 12:39 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
30 30 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/16 11:34 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Plaintiff's Counsel dated April 16, 2021. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/14 3:48 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending13 Complaint against Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Debbie Li. Related document:13 Complaint..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation
Thursday, April 01, 2021
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/01 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Mathew Friedman on behalf of Debbie Li..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/25 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven R Filosa, I on behalf of Debbie Li..(Filosa, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/18 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marjorie Mesidor on behalf of Debbie Li. New Address: Phillips & Associates, PLLC, Phillips & Associates PLLC, 585 Stewart Avenue, Suite 410, Garden City, NY, United States 11530, 2122487431..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
minutes Mediation Conference Wed 02/24 2:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 2/24/2021. Mediation Status due by 3/26/2021. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Thu 02/04 8:55 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 2/19/2021 was not held.(sb)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 02/04 9:00 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 2/24/2021 at 10:00 AM through video conference.(sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 01/19 1:18 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 2/19/2021 at 10:00 AM through video conference.(sb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
24 24 order Case Management Plan Fri 01/15 4:15 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is4 to 5 days. Deposition due by 5/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Status Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/15/2021) (kv)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 01/18 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/15/2021. (arc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
23 23 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Fri 01/08 3:47 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Letter Fri 01/08 3:45 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Plaintiff's Counsel dated January 8, 2021 re: Letter Pursuant to Order dated October 14, 2020. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 12/10 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 1/11/2021..(rpr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
21 21 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 11/16 2:41 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/09 2:20 PM
ANSWER to13 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith..(Merber, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
19 19 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 10/14 10:50 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that pursuant to the Southern District of New York's Second Amended Standing Administrative Order of October 1, 2015 regarding employment discrimination cases, this case is designated for automatic referral under the Court's existing Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation. In addition, initial discovery in this case shall be conducted in accordance with the Pilot Discovery Protocols for Counseled Employment Cases ("Discovery Protocols"). A copy of the Discovery Protocols is attached to this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Southern District mediation process is unsuccessful, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial status conference on January 15, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. In light of the COVID-19 crisis, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363- 4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/14/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
18 18 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/09 3:06 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:15 Letter, filed by Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than November 9, 2020. SO ORDERED. Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc. answer due 11/9/2020; Mark L. Goldsmith answer due 11/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/9/2020) (jca)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/09 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott H. Goldstein on behalf of Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith..(Goldstein, Scott)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/09 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth S. Merber on behalf of Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith..(Merber, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Fri 10/09 9:29 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Defendant, Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc. dated October 9, 2020 re: Request an Extension of Time to file Answer to the Complaint. Document filed by Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc...(Merber, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 09/18 4:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020; Mark L. Goldsmith served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Service was accepted by "J" DAVIS- CO-WORKER. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Phillips, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
13 13 cmp Complaint Tue 09/08 9:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, September 04, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 09/04 4:41 PM
ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/4/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 09/04 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark L. Goldsmith..(jgo)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 09/04 3:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/03 3:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark L. Goldsmith, Individually, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/03 3:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/03 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marjorie Mesidor on behalf of Debbie Li..(Mesidor, Marjorie)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/03 2:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Leave to File Document Thu 09/03 1:06 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File corrected complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Plaintiff's Counsel dated September 3, 2020. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 09/03 11:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lisa Marie Skruck. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mark L. Goldsmith, Individually. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/03 11:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lisa Marie Skruck to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. Do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties if Federal Question Basis of Jurisdiction is selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 09/03 11:14 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 09/03 11:15 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 09/03 11:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/03 2:59 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lisa Marie Skruck to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/02 3:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/02 2:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark L. Goldsmith, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/02 2:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/02 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Getting Out and Staying Out, Inc., Mark L. Goldsmith, Individually. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21456781)Document filed by Debbie Li..(Skruck, Lisa)
Related: [-]