Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:20-cv-01170
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2020
Last checked: Monday Mar 01, 2021 4:12 AM EST
Counter Claimant
AgroFresh, Inc
Represented By
Chad S.C. Stover
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Dr. Nazir Mir
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
MirTech, Inc.
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
AgroFresh, Inc
Represented By
Jessica M. Lindemann
contact info
Chad S.C. Stover
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Nazir Mir
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
MirTech, Inc.
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law, P.C.
contact info

GPO Sep 21 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/21/2021. (nms)
GPO Mar 23 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/23/2023. (nms)
GPO Apr 26 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER: AgroFresh's motion to dismiss Count II of AgroFresh's Amended Counterclaims (D.I. 110) is GRANTED. Count II of AgroFresh's Amended Counterclaims (D.I. 19) is DISMISED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/26/2023. (nms)
GPO May 01 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2023. (nms)
GPO Jun 14 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/14/2023. (nms)
GPO Jun 16 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER: AgroFresh's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of a Portion of Counterclaim III (D.I. 113) is GRANTED. The portion of Count III of AgroFresh's Amended Counterclaims asserting the Mir Parties breached the Judgment by failing to execute documents to transfer ownership of the European Patent Application is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Mir Parties' Nunc Pro Tunc Motion to Dismiss Count III With Prejudice and Answering Brief (D.I. 123) is DENIED (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/16/2023. (lah)
GPO Jul 11 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2023. (nms)
GPO Jul 11 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Mir Parties' Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (D.I. 130) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2023. (nms)
GPO Aug 25 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Mir Parties' Motion for Reargument (D.I. 146) is DENIED (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/25/2023. (lah)
GPO Oct 18 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2024. (aas)
GPO Jan 31 2025
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2025. (aas)
GPO Jan 31 2025
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendant's motion for reargument (D.I. 177) is GRANTED. The reargument is limited to the issues identified in this order. Defendant should file an opening brief, Plaintiffs an answering brief, and Defendant a reply brief. Defendant's opening brief is due two weeks from today. (see full Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2025. (aas)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
208 208 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 4:04 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, by Glenn A. Brown on behalf of MirTech, Inc. (Brown, Glenn) Modified on 5/8/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]