Virgin Islands District Court
Judge:Wilma A Lewis
Referred: George W Cannon, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-00074
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2020
Terminated:Aug 11, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 01, 2021 4:26 AM AST
Defendant
Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc
Represented By
Eugenio W.A. Geigel Simounet
Law Offices Of Wilfredo Geigel
contact info
Plaintiff
Mr. Cyrille George
Represented By
Renee D Dowling
Law Office Of Renee D. Dowing
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION (WAL) dated 08/10/2021 accompanying the Court's 16 Order. (MKG)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
19 19 misc Docket Annotation Tue 08/24 4:32 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SUPERIOR COURT. Certified copies of Memorandum Opinion and Order along with Docket Sheet received on August 24,2021 as to Cyrille George v. Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (TNS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
utility Civil Case Closed-Stipulation Wed 08/11 11:06 AM
Civil Case Closed. (TNS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
18 18 order Order on Motion to Change Venue Tue 08/10 8:30 PM
ORDER (WAL) dated 08/10/2021. UPON CONSIDERATION of Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc.'s10 "Motion for Change of Venue" and the Court's16 Order remanding this case back to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's10 "Motion for Change of Venue" is DENIED AS MOOT. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (MKG)
Related: [-]
17 17 16 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 08/10 8:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION (WAL) dated 08/10/2021 accompanying the Court's16 Order. (MKG)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Tue 08/10 8:22 PM
ORDER (WAL) dated 08/10/2021. GRANTING Plaintiff's4 "Motion for Remand"; ORDERING that the Clerk of Court is instructed to REMAND the matter to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to mark this case CLOSED. (MKG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
15 15 respm Reply to Tue 12/22 4:23 PM
REPLY to re14 Opposition to Motion filed by Plaintiff Cyrille George filed by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
14 14 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 12/09 3:05 PM
Opposition to Motion re10 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Cyrille George. (Dowling, Renee)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/04 10:30 AM
ORDER (GWC) dated 12/4/2020 directing Plaintiff to file a response to10 Motion for Change of Venue by 12/9/2020 (KMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 11/04 3:34 PM
TERMINATE Hearing (GWC) dated 11/4/20 (TNS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/02 9:49 AM
ORDER (GWC) dated 11/2/2020 denying11 Motion Requesting Leave to Attend Scheduling Conference Telephonically; continuing Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 until further order of the Court (KMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/27 10:44 AM
MOTION Requesting Leave to Attend Scheduling Conference Telephonically by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 26, 2020
10 10 motion Change Venue Mon 10/26 9:24 AM
MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 23, 2020
9 9 notice ~Notice (Other) Fri 10/23 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Joint Discovery and Scheduling Plan by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 notice ~Notice (Other) Fri 10/23 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Joint Discovery and Scheduling Plan by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 05, 2020
8 8 notice ~Notice (Other) Mon 10/05 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Rule 26 Voluntary Disclosures by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice ~Notice (Other) Mon 10/05 1:21 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Cyrille George (Dowling, Renee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
6 6 respm Reply to Opposition to Motion Wed 09/30 3:16 PM
REPLY to Opposition to Motion re5 Opposition to Motion For Remand filed by Plaintiff Cyrille George. (Dowling, Renee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
5 5 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 09/29 2:15 PM
Opposition to Motion re4 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 motion Remand Thu 09/17 1:31 PM
MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Cyrille George. (Dowling, Renee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Monday, September 14, 2020
3 3 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/14 1:33 PM
ORDER (GWC) dated 9/14/2020 Initial Disclosures due by 10/5/2020., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2020., Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/11 4:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 09/02 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Cyrille George from Superior Court Division of St. Croix, case number SX-20-CV-315. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AVIDC-882330) filed by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (AM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons