Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Christopher C Conner
Case #: 1:14-cv-00997
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 23, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 10:23 AM EST
Defendant
Shawn Reddington
Represented By
Karen A. Salvemini
Rhoads & Sinon, LLP
contact info
Todd J. Shill
Rhoades & Sinon
contact info
Defendant
Marcel Ruhland
Represented By
Karen A. Salvemini
Rhoads & Sinon, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tex Visions LLC
Represented By
Karen A. Salvemini
Rhoads & Sinon, LLP
contact info
Todd J. Shill
Rhoades & Sinon
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Werner
Represented By
Karen A. Salvemini
Rhoads & Sinon, LLP
contact info
Todd J. Shill
Rhoades & Sinon
contact info
Plaintiff
Cebrum George, II
Represented By
Kathryn V. Chandless
Chandless Law Offices, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
32 32 misc Stipulation Wed 05/04 11:52 AM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal by Ashley Werner, Marcel Ruhland, Shawn Reddington, Tex Visions LLC, filed by Ashley Werner, Marcel Ruhland, Shawn Reddington, Tex Visions LLC.(Snavely, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
31 31 misc Sealed Document (pdf only) Mon 03/14 4:46 PM
DOCUMENT SEALED (Confidential letter dated 2/10/16 addressed to Judge Arbuckle). (ch1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/27 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference in reference to the Settlement Conference that was held on 8/24/2015 has been set for 9/24/2015 10:00 AM in Williamsport before Judge William I. Arbuckle III. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone call to Chambers at (570) 323-9881, once all the parties are on the line. Signed by Judge William I. Arbuckle, III on 8/27/2015. (ch1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
25 25 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/30 9:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 8/24/2015 09:30 AM in Harrisburg before Judge William I. Arbuckle III. See Order for complete details.Signed by Judge William I. Arbuckle, III on 7/29/2015.(ch1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Settlement Checklist
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/01 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2015 11:00 AM before Judge William I. Arbuckle III. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone call to Chambers at (570) 323-9881, once all the parties are on the line.Signed by Judge William I. Arbuckle, III on 7/1/2015. (ch1)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
22 22 order Order Referring Case to Settlement Officer 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 06/29 2:26 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Purposes of Settlement Conference Only to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle, III - all proceedings before this Court STAYED pending completion of settlement process. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/29/15. (ki)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 27, 2015
21 21 misc Letter Sat 06/27 9:15 AM
Letter from counsel for the parties jointly requesting referral to medation . (Chandless, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 05/11 1:35 PM
ORDER granting pltf's unopposed motion to extend discovery deadline19 & setting forth revised pretrial & trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 7/13/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/15; Motions in Limine due by 11/6/15; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 12/10/15; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/15 @ 10:00 a.m. in Jury Rm #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 1/4/16 @ 9:30 a.m. in Ctrm #2. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/11/15. (ki)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/08 10:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cebrum George, II.(Chandless, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 13, 2015
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/13 3:11 PM
ORDER granting pltf's unopposed motion to extend the discovery ddl17 & setting forth revised pretrial & trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 5/11/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/15; Motions in Limine due by 9/14/15; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 10/14/15; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/15 @ 1:30 p.m. in Jury Rm #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 11/2/15 @ 9:30 a.m. in Ctrm #2.(See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/13/15. (ki)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/12 9:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cebrum George, II.(Chandless, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 06, 2015
16 16 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 02/06 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey E Snavely on behalf of All Defendants (Snavely, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
15 15 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 01/20 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Richard Martin on behalf of Shawn Reddington, Tex Visions LLC, Ashley Werner. (Martin, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 01/20 4:16 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Karen A. Salvemini terminated on behalf of Defendants, Tex Visions LLC, Shawn Reddington, and Ashley Werner. (Salvemini, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 09, 2014
13 13 Defendants' ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Shawn Reddington, Marcel Ruhland, Tex Visions LLC, Ashley Werner.(Salvemini, Karen)
Related: [-]
12 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cebrum George, II.(Chandless, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
11 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) - Sets forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretrial/trial schedule, inc. - Discovery due by 3/9/2015; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2015 @ 02:30 PM in Harrisburg - Jury Room 2; Jury Selection & Jury Trial set for 9/8/2015 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner; Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2015; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 8/12/2015. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/9/14. (ki)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 03, 2014
9 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Shawn Reddington, Tex Visions LLC, Ashley Werner. (Shill, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 04, 2014
8 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2014 @ 10:15 AM - placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibiilty of the plaintiff. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/4/14. (ki)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 01, 2014
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tex Visions LLC. (Salvemini, Karen)
Related: [-]
6 6 Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Shawn Reddington, Tex Visions LLC, Ashley Werner.(Salvemini, Karen)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen A. Salvemini on behalf of All Defendants. (Salvemini, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Shill on behalf of All Defendants. (Shill, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 27, 2014
3 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/27/14. (ki)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (aaa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
Friday, May 23, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-3110178), filed by Cebrum George, II.(aaa)
Related: [-]