Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Nanette K Laughrey
Case #: 2:14-cv-00466
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 23, 2014
Terminated:Sep 18, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 9:27 AM CST
Defendant
13th Judicial Circuit of Missouri
Defendant
Callaway County Sheriff Department
Defendant
Department of Mental Health
Defendant
Fulton Police Department
Defendant
Riders Car Detailing Automotive
Plaintiff
Michael Ayele
207 N Atlantic Ave
Ocean City, MD 21842


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, August 03, 2015
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/04 12:56 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Ayele. Related [+] (James, Carrie)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, May 26, 2015
7 7 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/27 10:45 AM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Ayele. Related [+] (James, Carrie)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, June 04, 2014
6 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Mr. Ayele's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,1 , is DENIED without prejudice. Mr. Ayele's answer to question III.E., on page 4 of his financial affidavit, is illegible and does not state the source of the income he receives. Further, Mr. Ayele's answer to question IV.D, on page 5 of his financial affidavit, is illegible. Mr. Ayele may resubmit his Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a new financial affidavit that is either typewritten or is in legible handwriting. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cross, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 29, 2014
5 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 5/29/14 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes, Renea) Modified on 5/29/2014 to reflect Order was not mailed to Plaintiff because Plaintiff receives notice electronically. (Matthes, Renea).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 27, 2014
4 4 NEW NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NEW NOTICE AND NEW MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Notice mailed to plaintiff.)(Bax, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
3 3 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER - Case reassigned to the Central Division of the Western District of Missouri and randomly assigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Dean Whipple no longer assigned to case. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 23, 2014
2 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Michael Ayele. (Travis, Kendra)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Ayele. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/9/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Travis, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet