Original Case: 2:18-cv-01850

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-35768
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2020
Terminated:Nov 23, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 25, 2020 12:38 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
ALDEN ROBERTS, M.D., each in their individual capacities
Represented By
Scott M. Barbara
AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MELANIE DELEON
Represented By
Scott M. Barbara
AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICAH MATTHEWS
Represented By
Scott M. Barbara
AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GORDON WRIGHT
Represented By
Scott M. Barbara
AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEPHEN CORREA, D.V.M.
Represented By
Scott M. Barbara
AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHNNY B. DELASHAW, Jr., M.D.
Represented By
Amy Magnano
Bennett Bigelow & Leedom P.S.
contact info
Michael Madden
Bennett Bigelow & Leedom P.S.
contact info
Michael Madderra
Bennett Bigelow & Leedom P.S.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/25/2020 12:33 AM PST
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Johnny B. Delashaw Jr. Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/08/2020. Appellant Johnny B. Delashaw Jr. opening brief due 10/30/2020. Appellees Stephen Correa, Melanie DeLeon, Micah Matthews, Alden Roberts and Gordon Wright answering brief due 11/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11809050] (JMR) [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:46 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to all Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet