California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:20-cv-08059
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2020
Terminated:Dec 17, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 12:47 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Etoro USA LLC
Represented By
William E Thomson, Jr
Brooks Kushman PC
contact info
William E. Thomson, Jr.
Brooks Kushman P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Handsome Music, LLC
Represented By
Ryan James Altomare
J Lorenzo Law
contact info
Jayson Michael Lorenzo
J. Lorenzo Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, December 18, 2020
26 26 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Fri 12/18 3:53 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (yl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
Thursday, December 17, 2020
25 25 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 12/18 3:26 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Pursuant to the Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court orders that such judgment be entered. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (yl)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 12/18 1:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS14 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction over Defendant. To the extent Plaintiff seeks leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, such a request is DENIED as futile. The First Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling claims against Defendant before a court of competent jurisdiction. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
23 23 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 12/07 4:27 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 14 filed by Defendant Etoro USA LLC. (Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
22 22 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 11/30 6:38 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed NON-PAPER PHYSICAL EXHIBITS re Response in Opposition to Motion,20 (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 11/30 6:35 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 14 Filed in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Handsome Music, LLC. (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/30 6:32 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 14 filed by Plaintiff Handsome Music, LLC.(Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ryan J. Altomare,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jayson M. Lorenzo,
Att: 3 Declaration of Peter Luke Adams
Monday, November 16, 2020
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 11/16 10:01 AM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Etoro USA LLC, identifying etoro Group Ltd. (Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 11/13 3:09 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Declaration (Motion related) Fri 11/13 1:23 PM
DECLARATION of Erica Klein in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 14 filed by Defendant Etoro USA LLC.(Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Emails between Lorenzo and Klein
16 16 respm Declaration (Motion related) Fri 11/13 1:21 PM
DECLARATION of Guy Pinchas Hirsch in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 14 filed by Defendant Etoro USA LLC.(Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emails between Lorenzo and Klein
15 15 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 11/13 1:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 14 filed by Defendant Etoro USA LLC. (Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 11/13 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendant Etoro USA LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 30, 2020
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 10/30 5:28 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Etoro USA LLC answer now due 11/13/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition9 filed by defendant Etoro USA LLC.(Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 10/16 8:46 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Etoro USA LLC answer now due 10/30/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition9 filed by Defendant Etoro USA LLC.(Attorney William E Thomson, Jr added to party Etoro USA LLC(pty:dft))(Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
11 11 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 10/15 4:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Handsome Music, LLC Handsome Music, LLC, re Amended Complaint/Petition9 served on 10/5/2020. (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 10/07 10:49 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Handsome Music, LLC, upon Defendant Etoro USA LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
9 9 6 pgs othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 10/02 12:09 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 , filed by Plaintiff Handsome Music, LLC(Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/04 4:32 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/03 3:16 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint2 as to defendant Etoro USA LLC. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 09/03 3:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/03 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 09/03 9:11 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by HANDOME MUSIC, LLC. (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 09/03 9:09 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 filed by Plaintiff HANDOME MUSIC, LLC. (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/03 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 09/03/2020, receipt number ACACDC-27917877), filed by Plaintiff HANDOME MUSIC, LLC. (Attorney Ryan James Altomare added to party HANDOME MUSIC, LLC(pty:pla))(Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/03 8:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff HANDOME MUSIC, LLC. (Altomare, Ryan)
Related: [-]