Cox v. Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Xavier Rodriguez |
Referred: | Richard B Farrer |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-01046 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 3:53 AM CST |
Defendant
Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allen Tharp
|
Represented By
|
Neutral
Elizabeth S. Chestney
|
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Cox
|
Represented By
|
![]() ORDER DENYING 23 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER --It is hereby ORDERED that these consolidated cases are DISMISSED, subject to reinstatement upon motion within thirty (30) days of this date. All pending deadlines are hereby VACATED.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
![]() AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 2/14/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) |
|
Monday, November 08, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order by Spencer Cox. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() ORDER -The parties, therefore, are ORDERED to file a proposed amended scheduling order, as shown in the attached formats, to govern the remainderof this case, ( Amended Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2021,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) |
|
27 | 27
![]() ORDER DENYING23 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER OF TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez for all proceedings. Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/09 4:46 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) |
||
Monday, August 02, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp, re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Defendant Allen Tharp (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Spencer Cox, re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Defendant Allen Tharp(Galo, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp.(Kilgore, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2021, Discovery due by 6/24/2021, Motions due by 7/22/2021,. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Spencer Cox. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Scheduling Recommendations Joint Amended by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ADVISORY REGARDING OUTCOME OF MEDIATION --The undersigned now notifies the District Court that the case DID NOT SETTLE during mediation and the case is RETURNED to the District Court for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE, ( Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR/Mediation. Elizabeth S. Chestney appointed as Neutral. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) |
|
15 | 15
![]() ORDER GRANTING12 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer: Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL MATTERS AND PENDING MOTIONS( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2020,, Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Scheduling Recommendations Joint by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr) |
|
8 | 8
![]() COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Defendants' Original ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp.(Kilgore, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC as to Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC. Waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allen Tharp as to Allen Tharp. Waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Kilgore, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (cd) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Spencer Cox. (Galo, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13928905), filed by Spencer Cox.(Galo, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/04 10:53 AM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Fri 09/04 10:55 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (cd) |