Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Referred: Richard B Farrer
Case #: 5:20-cv-01046
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2020
Terminated:Feb 24, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 3:53 AM CST
Defendant
Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC
Represented By
Robert D. Kilgore
Gardner Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Allen Tharp
Represented By
Robert D. Kilgore
Gardner Law Firm
contact info
Neutral
Elizabeth S. Chestney
Plaintiff
Spencer Cox
Represented By
Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Galo Law Firm, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 25 2021
ORDER DENYING 23 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
33 33 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/17 10:52 AM
ORDER --It is hereby ORDERED that these consolidated cases are DISMISSED, subject to reinstatement upon motion within thirty (30) days of this date. All pending deadlines are hereby VACATED.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
32 32 order Judgment Fri 02/25 10:52 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
31 31 2 pgs order Order Fri 11/19 11:39 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
30 30 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/09 1:29 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 2/14/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
29 29 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 11/08 5:04 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order by Spencer Cox. (Galo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
28 28 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/25 4:37 PM
ORDER -The parties, therefore, are ORDERED to file a proposed amended scheduling order, as shown in the attached formats, to govern the remainderof this case, ( Amended Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2021,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
27 27 21 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 10/25 4:35 PM
ORDER DENYING23 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 09/09 4:48 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez for all proceedings. Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/09 4:46 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/02 3:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp, re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Defendant Allen Tharp (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/26 2:35 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Spencer Cox, re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Defendant Allen Tharp(Galo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Proposed Order
Monday, July 12, 2021
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Mon 07/12 4:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp.(Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Allen Tharp,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Friday, February 26, 2021
22 22 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/01 10:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2021, Discovery due by 6/24/2021, Motions due by 7/22/2021,. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
21 21 trial Expert Witness List Tue 01/12 11:00 AM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Spencer Cox. (Galo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
20 20 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 12/14 12:20 PM
Scheduling Recommendations Joint Amended by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/08 3:32 PM
ADVISORY REGARDING OUTCOME OF MEDIATION --The undersigned now notifies the District Court that the case DID NOT SETTLE during mediation and the case is RETURNED to the District Court for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
18 18 6 pgs order Order Fri 11/06 9:53 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/30 11:32 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE, ( Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
16 16 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR/Mediation Thu 10/29 3:49 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR/Mediation. Elizabeth S. Chestney appointed as Neutral. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 10/29 2:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference Thu 10/29 2:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer: Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Thu 10/22 4:16 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Protective Order Thu 10/22 11:46 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion for Protective Order
Friday, October 16, 2020
11 11 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/19 11:53 AM
ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL MATTERS AND PENDING MOTIONS( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2020,, Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
10 10 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 10/01 12:39 PM
Scheduling Recommendations Joint by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
9 9 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/29 12:10 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/29 11:39 AM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
7 7 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Tue 09/29 11:37 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 1:47 PM
Defendants' Original ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp.(Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/04 2:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC as to Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC. Waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/04 2:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allen Tharp as to Allen Tharp. Waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Kilgore, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/04 11:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Olde England's Lion & Rose Rim, LLC, Allen Tharp. (cd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/03 10:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Spencer Cox. (Galo, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/03 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13928905), filed by Spencer Cox.(Galo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/04 10:53 AM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 09/04 10:55 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (cd)
Related: [-]