Castro v. Fire Door Solutions, LLC
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00753 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Sumner County Chancery Court Sumner County Chancery Court, 83CH1-2020-CV-82 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 3:49 AM CST |
Defendant
Fire Door Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Castro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
60 | 60
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No.59 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/11/2022. (ln) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
59 | 59
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation) with Prejudice by Fire Door Solutions, LLC. (Hull, Daniel) |