Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:20-cv-00753
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2020
Terminated:Feb 11, 2022
Case in other court:Sumner County Chancery Court Sumner County Chancery Court, 83CH1-2020-CV-82
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 3:49 AM CST
Defendant
Fire Door Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Daniel P. Hull
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
contact info
James Gerard Stranch, IV
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Castro
Represented By
Keith C. Dennen
Farris Bobango, PLC
contact info

GPO Jun 07 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/7/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
GPO Nov 09 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: FDS' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 35) is DENIED. The Court further orders the following: The parties shall make a good faith effort to resolve any disputes remaining between them in this case and in their related case (Case No. 3:21-cv-00622) under the supervision of a mediator within 45 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/9/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 11, 2022
60 60 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/11 4:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No.59 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/11/2022. (ln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
59 59 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/09 4:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation) with Prejudice by Fire Door Solutions, LLC. (Hull, Daniel)
Related: [-]