Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10481

Georgia Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:Austin E Carter
Case #: 1:20-ap-01036
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2020
Terminated:Apr 07, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC
652 N. Coney Road
Cordele, GA 31015
Represented By
Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA
P.O. Box 1606
Macon, GA 31202
Represented By
John T. McGoldrick, Jr.
Martin Snow, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/07 3:54 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1036 Closed. (Irby, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/27 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
12 12 order Dismissing Adversary Case Tue 03/23 5:09 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Court to followup on Final Report or closing: 4/6/2021. Signed on 3/23/2021 **Main case has been dismissed. (Irby, T.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/05 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order
Friday, October 30, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/02 8:48 AM
Scheduling Order re: Adversary case 20-01036 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Complaint by AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA against Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint. Discovery due by 2/26/2021, Motions for Summary Judgment due by 3/28/2021, Joint Pre Trial Stipulation due by 4/12/2021. Signed on 10/30/2020 (Ferguson, L
Thursday, October 29, 2020
court Hearing Held Thu 10/29 3:38 PM
Hearing Held Related [+]. JUDGE TO ENTER A 120 DAY SCHEDULING ORDER. Order/Withdrawal Follow-up Due: 11/6/2020. (Vaughn, V.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA,
Friday, October 02, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/02 5:11 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC (Boyer, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 19, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/20 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Alias Summons Issued
Friday, September 18, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 09/18 9:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC 9/18/2020 Related [+] (McGoldrick, John)
Related: [-] 6 Alias Summons Issued
Thursday, September 17, 2020
6 6 court Alias Summons Issued Thu 09/17 1:03 PM
Alias Summons issued on Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC Date Issued 9/17/2020, Answer Due 10/19/2020. Certificate of Service of Summons due no later than: 9/24/2020. (Ferguson, L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
5 5 misc Request to Clerk to Issue Summons Wed 09/16 3:33 PM
Request to Clerk to Issue Summons. Pre trial conference to be held on October 29, 2020, time: 2:00 p.m., location: Macon Courtroom B, Defendant: Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC filed by Plaintiff AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA (McGoldrick, John) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Ferguson, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/11 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 09/08 12:37 PM
Summons issued on Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC Date Issued 9/8/2020, Answer Due 10/8/2020. Certificate of Service of Summons due no later than: 9/15/2020. (Ferguson, L)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set on Complaint Tue 09/08 12:39 PM
Adversary case 20-01036 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Complaint by AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA against Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM at Macon Courtroom B. (Ferguson, L)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA
Friday, September 04, 2020
2 2 misc Request to Clerk to Issue Summons Fri 09/04 1:12 PM
Request to Clerk to Issue Summons. Pre trial conference to be held on October 29, 2020, time: 2:00 p.m., location: Macon Courtroom B, Defendant: Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC filed by Plaintiff AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA (McGoldrick, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/04 12:57 PM
Adversary case 20-01036 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Complaint by AgGeorgia Farm Credit, ACA against Harpe Farms of South Georgia, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (McGoldrick, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Security Agreements
Att: 3 Exhibit C - UCC Financing Statements