New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Referred: Stewart D Aaron
Case #: 1:20-cv-07246
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1333mc Marine Contract
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2020
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 03, 2021 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Ridgebury Kilo LLC
Represented By
Thomas Hunt Belknap, Jr
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Emma Cothi Jones
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
John Devereux Kimball
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Seawolf Tankers Inc.
Represented By
James H. Power
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Freepoint Commodities LLC
Represented By
Peter Judge Gutowski
Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP
contact info
Yaakov U. Adler
Freehill Hogan & Mahar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Freepoint Commodities Singapore PTE Ltd.
Represented By
Peter Judge Gutowski
Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP
contact info
Yaakov U. Adler
Freehill Hogan & Mahar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurel Shipping LLC
Represented By
Peter Judge Gutowski
Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP
contact info
Yaakov U. Adler
Freehill Hogan & Mahar LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Claimant
Ridgebury Kilo LLC
Terminated: 12/01/2020
Represented By
Thomas Hunt Belknap, Jr
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Emma Cothi Jones
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
John Devereux Kimball
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Cross Defendant
Seawolf Tankers Inc.
Terminated: 12/01/2020


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 24, 2024
208 208 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 05/24 4:34 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Freepoint Commodities LLC, Freepoint Commodities Singapore PTE Ltd., Laurel Shipping LLC..(Gutowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order Fri 05/24 2:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Peter Gutowski to RE-FILE Document No. 207 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the wrong event type was used to file the proposed order; (2) the proposed order is not signed (ink signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
207 207 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/23 3:09 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Freepoint Commodities LLC, Freepoint Commodities Singapore PTE Ltd., Laurel Shipping LLC..(Gutowski, Peter)
Related: [-]