Illinois Central District Court
Case #: 2:20-cr-20057
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Sep 06, 2020 2:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Ryan I Woodruff (1)
Represented By
Lawrence S Beaumont
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elham M Peirson
Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/06/2020 2:47 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
TEXT ORDER as to Ryan I Woodruff entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/18/20. An Initial Appearance is set for 2/18/2020 at 1:45 PM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (KM, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Ryan I Woodruff (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/18/2020 granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Ryan I Woodruff (1). (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Government by AUSA Elly Peirson. Defendant RYAN I WOODRUFF present in person and with counsel Larry Beaumont. Initial Appearance as to Ryan I Woodruff held. Defendant advised of charges and possible penalties. Cause called for preliminary hearing. Oral motion by the Defendant to continue. Motion granted. Oral motion by the Government for detention of the defendant. Oral motion by the Defendant to continue detention hearing. Court grants oral motion and the preliminary and Detention Hearings are set for 2/19/2020 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Tape #UR-B: 1:42PM.) (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Ryan I Woodruff (1). (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
2 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Complaint UNREDACTED (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lawrence S Beaumont appearing for Ryan I Woodruff (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
5 5 TEMPORARY ORDER OF DETENTION as to Ryan I Woodruff entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/18/2020. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) Modified on 2/20/2020 to show the correct filing date. (JMB, ilcd). [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Government by AUSA Elly Peirson. Defendant RYAN I WOODRUFF present in person and with counsel Larry Beaumont. Cause called for Preliminary Hearing. Oral motion by the Government to continue; motion GRANTED. Preliminary Hearing continued to 2/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Cause called for Detention Hearing as to Ryan I Woodruff. Arguments and evidence heard. Oral motion by the Defendant to continue; motion GRANTED. Detention Hearing continued to 2/21/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Counsel granted leave to reopen evidence. Temporary detention order remains in effect. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Tape #UR-B: 5:21PM.) (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
6 6 + + PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Ryan I Woodruff (Merritt, Melissa) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by Ryan I Woodruff. (DS, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held 2/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Government by AUSA Elham Peirson. Defendant RYAN WOODRUFF present in person and with counsel, Lawrence Beaumont. Cause called for Detention Hearing. Oral Motion by Defendant to continue the hearing. No objection; oral motion granted. Detention Hearing reset for 2/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. (Tape #UR-B 2:33 PM.) (DS, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
7 7 + + FIRST PRETRIAL SERVICE REPORT ADDENDUM as to Ryan I Woodruff (Merritt, Melissa) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/18/2020 as to Ryan I Woodruff. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
TEXT ORDER as to Ryan I Woodruff entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/25/2020. The Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/26/20 are CONTINUED to 3/2/20 at 3:15 PM. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
9 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff.(Peirson, Elham) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Waiver of Preliminary Hearing
Thursday, February 27, 2020
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/27/2020. The government's Motion to Extend Time to Seek Indictment Under the Speedy Trial Act9 is GRANTED. The government's deadline to file formal charging documents is extended to 4/16/20. Based on the Unopposed Motion, the Court finds the failure to grant a continuance would deny the parties the opportunity to seek additional evaluations and documents. The Court finds the ends of justice served by taking such action outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial and the time between 2/16/20 through 4/16/20 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act.(JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shannon M. O'Brien appearing for USA. (Peirson, Elham) Modified on 2/28/2020 to correct attorney's name (KM, ilcd). [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Government by AUSA Elly Peirson. Defendant RYAN I WOODRUFF present in person and with counsel Larry Beaumont. Preliminary hearing waived. Wavier is attached to9 and accepted pursuant to the text order entered in this case on 2/27/2020. Court finds probable cause and the case is bound over to the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing on previous oral motion for detention. Oral motion DENIED. Defendant is ordered released after processing. (Tape #UR-B-3:23PM.) (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
11 11 + + SECOND PRETRIAL SERVICE REPORT ADDENDUM as to Ryan I Woodruff (Bice, Michael) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
12 12 Personal Recognizance Bond Entered as to Ryan I Woodruff (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/2/2020. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
14 14 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Bond papers UNREDACTED (JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
Receipt #24626009350 for Surrender of Passport as to Ryan I Woodruff; Passport Number 573083103 issued by USA. (KM, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
15 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Second) by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff. (Peirson, Elham) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/23/20. The government's Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Seek Indictment Under the Speedy Trial Act15 is GRANTED. The government's deadline to file formal charging documents is extended to 6/16/20. Based on the Unopposed Motion, the Court finds the failure to grant a continuance would deny the parties the opportunity to seek additional evaluations and documents. The Court also finds the extension necessary to stem the spread of COVID-19. The Court finds the ends of justice served by taking such action outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial and the time between 4/16/20 through 6/16/20 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act. (KM, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
16 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff. (Peirson, Elham) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/11/2020. The government's Third Motion to Extend Time to Seek Indictment Under the Speedy Trial Act16 is GRANTED. The government's deadline to file formal charging documents is extended to 7/16/20. Based on the Unopposed Motion, the Court finds the failure to grant a continuance would deny the parties the opportunity to seek additional evaluations and documents. The Court finds the ends of justice served by taking such action outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial and the time between 6/16/20 through 7/16/20 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act.(JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
17 17 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Ryan I Woodruff. (Peirson, Elham) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/13/2020. The government's Motion to Extend Time to Seek Indictment Under the Speedy Trial Act17 is GRANTED. The government's deadline to file formal charging documents is extended to 8/15/20. Based on the Unopposed Motion, the Court finds the failure to grant a continuance would deny the parties the opportunity to seek additional evaluations and documents. The Court finds the ends of justice served by taking such action outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial and the time between 7/16/20 through 8/15/20 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act.(JMB, ilcd) [2:20-mj-07027-EIL]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL in case as to Ryan I Woodruff entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/7/20. Judge Bruce hereby disqualifies and recuses himself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2). Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge Sara Darrow, this matter is reassigned to Judge Michael M. Mihm for all further proceedings. (KM, ilcd)
Related: [-]
18 18 INFORMATION as to Ryan I Woodruff (1) count 1 with Forfeiture Notice. (KM, ilcd)
Related: [-]
19 19 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET. (KM, ilcd)
Related: [-]