Original Case: 3:19-cv-01997

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cr-10914
Typecivil rights / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2020
Terminated:Feb 05, 2021
Last checked: Monday Feb 08, 2021 2:38 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
ARLO (Arlo Technologies, Incorporated)
Represented By
Skyler Howton
Perkins Coie, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HomePro Operating, L.L.C.
Represented By
Michael Edward Coles
Coles Firm, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth Aten Lamberson
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Apple, Incorporated
Represented By
William Gray Cochran
Scott, Douglass & McConnico, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Walt Disney Company
Represented By
Christopher Michael Boeck
Locke Lord, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Best Buy Company, Incorporated
Represented By
Donna C. Peavler
PeavlerBriscoe
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Target Corporation
Represented By
Donna C. Peavler
PeavlerBriscoe
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Walmart, Incorporated
Represented By
Aaron George Stendell
Cooper & Scully, P.C.
contact info
Derek Shane Davis
Cooper & Scully, P.C.
contact info
Michelle Elaine Robberson
Cooper & Scully, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Home Depot Product Authority, L.L.C.
Represented By
Robert A. Ewert
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RING (Amazon.com, Incorporated)
Represented By
Ryan Spear
Perkins Coie, L.L.P.
contact info
Skyler Howton
Perkins Coie, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department, Menifee, California
Represented By
David R. Reeder
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LG Electronics, USA Incorporated
Represented By
Jana H. Taylor
Sheehy Ware and Pappas, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Verizon Communications, Incorporated
Represented By
Tab Henry Keener
Downs & Stanford, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City of Grand Prairie
Represented By
James Thomas Jeffrey Jr.
Law Offices of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City of Mansfield
Represented By
James Thomas Jeffrey Jr.
Law Offices of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Menifee Police Department
Represented By
David R. Reeder
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Defendant - Appellee
Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Brian Walters Stoltz
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ryan Holt, Waco Police Department, Waco, Texas
Represented By
Joe Anthony Rivera
Naman, Howell, Smith & Lee, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Roy Lee Barrett
Naman, Howell, Smith & Lee, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Charles Edge, Ellis County Sheriff
Represented By
David Randall Montgomery
D. Randall Montgomery & Associates, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Brian Manley, Austin Police Department, Austin, Texas
Represented By
Sameer Singh Birring
City of Austin
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Tracy Aaron, Mansfield Police Department, Mansfield, Texas
Represented By
James Thomas Jeffrey Jr.
Law Offices of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Will Johnson, Arlington Police Department, Arlington, Texas
Represented By
Nastasha Anderson
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Cynthia Jane Withers
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Robert Harris Fugate
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Robert Fite, Grand Prairie Fire Department, Grand Prairie, Texas
Represented By
James Thomas Jeffrey Jr.
Law Offices of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Steve Dye, Grand Prairie Police Department, Grand Prairie, Texas
Represented By
James Thomas Jeffrey Jr.
Law Offices of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dominique Artis, Dallas Fire Department, Dallas, Texas
Represented By
Tatia R. Wilson
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Nicholas Dane Palmer
City Attorney's Office
contact info
James Bickford Pinson
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Devin Quaalon Alexander
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
U. Renee Hall, Dallas Police Department, Dallas, Texas
Represented By
Tatia R. Wilson
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Nicholas Dane Palmer
City Attorney's Office
contact info
James Bickford Pinson
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Devin Quaalon Alexander
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Gary C. Thomas, Dallas Area Rapid Transit
Represented By
Harold R. McKeever Jr.
Dallas Area Rapid Transit
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Steven McCraw, Texas Department of Public Safety
Represented By
Kelsey Warren
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Brian Walters Stoltz
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
James McHenry, Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By
Brian Walters Stoltz
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Brian Walters Stoltz
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
United States
Represented By
Brian Walters Stoltz
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
Represented By
Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
contact info

GPO Feb 05 2021
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [20-10914 Affirmed ] Judge: EGJ, Judge: JWE, Judge: JEG. Mandate issue date is 03/30/2021 [20-10914]

Docket last updated: 02/08/2021 2:38 AM CST
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
29 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera 20-10914 (LEF)
Related: [-]