California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:20-cv-06393
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 10, 2021 1:37 AM PST
Defendant
Qiang Du
Represented By
Willmore Frederick Holbrow, III
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Matthew Lawrence Seror
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Glenn Philip Zwang
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Successful Match Canada, Inc.
Represented By
Willmore Frederick Holbrow, III
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Matthew Lawrence Seror
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Glenn Philip Zwang
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
SuccessfulMatch.com
Represented By
Willmore Frederick Holbrow, III
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Matthew Lawrence Seror
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Glenn Philip Zwang
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Reflex Media, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Lee Smith
Smith Washburn, LLP
contact info
Jacob Lex Fonnesbeck
Smith Washburn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD.
Represented By
Mark Lee Smith
Smith Washburn, LLP
contact info
Jacob Lex Fonnesbeck
Smith Washburn, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 27 2021
ORDER RE SERVICE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/27/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
GPO Dec 06 2022
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/6/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
GPO Jul 24 2023
ORDER RE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/24/2023. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
GPO Jan 16 2024
SECOND ORDER RE SEALING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/16/2024. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2024)
GPO Jan 16 2024
ORDER RE JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/16/2024. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2024)
GPO Nov 26 2024
ORDER re Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions of Hal Poret and Brian Sowers. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/26/2024. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2024)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
200 200 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/02 10:50 AM
ORDER: The request to continue the pretrial and trial dates, Dkt. No. 198-99, is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/2/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
199 199 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/28 12:11 PM
MOTION REQUESTING ALTERNATIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES re 197 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Set/Clear Flags, filed by SuccessfulMatch.com, Successful Match Canada, Inc., Qiang Du. Responses due by 4/11/2025. Replies due by 4/18/2025.(Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Willmore F. Holbrow III in Support of Unopposed Motion,
Att: 2 Proposed Order