Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:20-cv-02764
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2020
Terminated:Dec 17, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 10, 2021 1:22 AM MST
Defendant
Koch Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Walker Pedigo
Baker Donelson Pc-Jackson
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Lee Allen Mickus
Evans Fears & Schuttert LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Poultry, Inc.
Represented By
Bradley David Justus
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kail Janak Jethmalani
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider Llp-New York
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Bradley David Justus
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kail Janak Jethmalani
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider Llp-New York
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Chicken, Inc.
Represented By
Bradley David Justus
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kail Janak Jethmalani
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider Llp-New York
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Breeders, Inc.
Represented By
Bradley David Justus
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kail Janak Jethmalani
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider Llp-New York
contact info
Defendant
Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Represented By
Stacy L. Pepper
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Christa C. Cottrell
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Daniel E. Laytin
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Represented By
Stacy L. Pepper
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Christa C. Cottrell
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Daniel E. Laytin
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)
Represented By
Stacy L. Pepper
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Christa C. Cottrell
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Daniel E. Laytin
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By
Stacy L. Pepper
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Christa C. Cottrell
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Daniel E. Laytin
Kirkland & Ellis Llp-Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Represented By
Frederick J. Baumann
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp-Denver
contact info
Carrie C. Mahan
Weil Gotshal & Manges Llp-Dc
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Caitlin C. McHugh
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Perdue Foods, LLC
Represented By
Gregory E. Goldberg
Holland & Hart Llp-Denver
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Koch Meat Co., Inc.
Represented By
Scott Walker Pedigo
Baker Donelson Pc-Jackson
contact info
Kevin M. Shea
Richilano Shea, LLC
contact info
Lee Allen Mickus
Evans Fears & Schuttert LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marc McEntire
Represented By
Kevin Thomas Schutte
Otteson Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen McEntire
Represented By
Kevin Thomas Schutte
Otteson Shapiro LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, December 18, 2020
50 50 misc Status Report Fri 12/18 11:25 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire.(Schutte, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order
Thursday, December 17, 2020
49 49 misc Transmittal of Documents - Interdistrict Fri 12/18 9:50 AM
Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the48 Certified Copy of the Transfer Order to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. InterdistrictTransfer_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
Related: [-]
48 48 order MDL Conditional Transfer Order Fri 12/18 9:48 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-02764 PAB-NTW, to the Eastern District of Oklahoma, to become part of MDL 2977 by Clerk on 12/17/2020. (evana, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
47 47 respm Brief in Support of Motion Wed 12/16 9:17 AM
BRIEF in Support of21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to the First-To-File Rule filed by Defendants Perdue Foods, LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.. (Shea, Kevin)
Related: [-]