Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:20-bk-11870
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mariner Seafood, LLC
86 MacArthur Dr
New Bedford, MA 02740-7214
Represented By
Christopher M. Condon
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109


1. New Bedford's Mariner Seafood files Chapter 11. (seafoodsource.com)
Submitted Tue 09/15/2020
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, September 25, 2020
54 54 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 09/25 5:00 PM
Equity Security Holders Related [+] filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 13 Order to Update
53 53 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 09/25 4:58 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
52 52 misc Schedules (Original) Fri 09/25 4:57 PM
Schedules A-H. filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
51 51 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 10:10 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral
50 50 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 9:43 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 48 Application to Employ
49 49 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 9:41 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 47 Application to Employ
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
48 48 motion Employ Wed 09/23 5:03 PM
Application filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC to Employ Navera Group, LLC as Financial Advisor filed with Affidavit along with certificate of service. (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
47 47 motion Employ Wed 09/23 4:55 PM
Application filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC to Employ Murphy & King, Professional Corporation as Counsel filed with Affidavit along with certificate of service. (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
46 46 trustee Notice of Rescheduled/Amended Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Tue 09/22 12:18 PM
Amended Notice of Rescheduled Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. The Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/14/2020 at 12:30 PM as Telephonic Meeting. Dial-In Number: (877) 730-9980 Participant Code: 6483271#. For international call information, please contact the Trustee. (Sprague, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
45 45 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 09/21 1:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph S.U. Bodoff with certificate of service filed by Creditor Titania Seafood Limited (Bodoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 19, 2020
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/20 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order
Friday, September 18, 2020
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion To Sell
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Impound or Seal
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order To Set Hearing
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Motion to Pay
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion for Order/Authority
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
36 36 notice Notice Fri 09/18 3:11 PM
Notice of Amendment to Asset Purchase Agreement Related [+] filed by Debtor Mariner Seafood, LLC (Condon, Christopher)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Sell