Original Case: 6:18-cv-01456

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-prici-13407
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit151 Contract - Medicare Act
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 15, 2020 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
AIX SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Angel A. Cortinas
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA
contact info
Jonathan H. Kaskel
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC
Represented By
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, PL
contact info
Frank Carlos Quesada
MSP Recovery Law Firm
contact info
Steve Ian Silverman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, PL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SERIES 16-05-456
Represented By
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, PL
contact info
Frank Carlos Quesada
MSP Recovery Law Firm
contact info
Steve Ian Silverman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, PL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SERIES 16-11-509
Represented By
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, PL
contact info
Frank Carlos Quesada
MSP Recovery Law Firm
contact info
Steve Ian Silverman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, PL
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2020 4:18 AM EDT
Thursday, September 10, 2020
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 16-05-456 and Series 16-11-509 on 09/09/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/20/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/24/2020 as to Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/08/2020 as to Appellee AIX Specialty Insurance Company
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 28 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 25 pgs USDC Order, DE # 185
Att: 4 2 pgs USDC Judgment, DE # 187