New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:20-cv-12710
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2020
Terminated:Oct 20, 2020
Case in other court:Bergen County Superior Court of NJ, BER-L-004733-20
Last checked: Sunday Mar 14, 2021 4:28 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
DSW SHOE WAREHOUSE, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL F. MCKEON
Lavin O'Neil Ricci Cedrone & Disipio
contact info
Counter Defendant
RAMSEY INTERSTATE CENTER LLC
Represented By
CYNTHIA D. SANTOMAURO
Cooke & Santomauro, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DSW SHOE WAREHOUSE, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL F. MCKEON
Lavin O'Neil Ricci Cedrone & Disipio
contact info
Plaintiff
RAMSEY INTERSTATE CENTER LLC
Represented By
CYNTHIA D. SANTOMAURO
Cooke & Santomauro, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, June 03, 2021
minutes Status Conference Fri 06/25 3:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Status Conference via telephone held on 6/3/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
16 16 order Order Mon 04/26 11:55 AM
TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on June 3, 2021 at 4:30 p.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in the conference call. If counsel are not available for the conference call or have any questions, please email chambers at mf_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 4/26/21.(LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
minutes Status Conference Settlement Conference Fri 04/23 4:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Status/Settlement Conference via telephone held on 4/20/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
15 15 order Order Wed 03/31 2:30 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the telephone conference before the Undersigned on March 31, 2021 is hereby rescheduled to April 20, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in on the conference call. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/31/31.(LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
14 14 order Order Tue 03/30 12:23 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the telephone conference before the Undersigned on March 30, 2021 is hereby rescheduled to March 31, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in on the conference call. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/30/21.(LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
13 13 order Order Fri 03/19 3:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on March 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in the conference call. If counsel are not available for the conference call or have any questions, please email chambers at mf_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/19/21.(LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
12 12 order Order Fri 10/23 9:44 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of D.E. 11, the scheduling conference set for October 26, 2020 is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2020. (TAD)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Fri 10/23 9:44 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of D.E. 11, the scheduling conference set for October 26, 2020 is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2020. (TAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
11 11 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 10/20 12:16 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Case Nos. 20-cv-12699 and 20-cv-12710 are consolidated for all purposes under lead docket no. 20-cv-12699. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/20/20. (jc, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/20 12:19 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
10 10 misc Letter Fri 10/16 9:27 AM
Letter from Michael F. McKeon, Esquire on Behalf of DSW Shoe Warehouse Inc..(MCKEON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, October 05, 2020
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 10/05 6:02 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 10/23/2020. To join the conference call, dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/5/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
8 8 misc Letter Wed 09/30 4:03 PM
Letter from Michael F. McKeon, Esquire on Behalf of DSW Shoe Warehouse Inc.. (MCKEON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Wed 09/30 2:21 PM
RESPONSE re6 Answer to Counterclaim.(MCKEON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 24, 2020
6 6 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 09/24 11:40 AM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim with Separate Defenses by RAMSEY INTERSTATE CENTER LLC.(SANTOMAURO, CYNTHIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 09/22 4:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAMSEY INTERSTATE CENTER LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (SANTOMAURO, CYNTHIA)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/22 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA D. SANTOMAURO on behalf of RAMSEY INTERSTATE CENTER LLC (SANTOMAURO, CYNTHIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 09/21 1:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against RAMSEY INTERSTATE CENTER LLC by DSW SHOE WAREHOUSE, INC..(MCKEON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/16 11:28 AM
Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 09/15 11:44 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DSW Shoe Warehouse, Inc. identifying Designer Brands Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCKEON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 09/15 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DSW Shoe Warehouse, Inc. from Bergen County Superior Court of NJ, case number BER-L-004733-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11356549), filed by DSW Shoe Warehouse, Inc..(MCKEON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 09/15 1:30 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters; select party if already in the system without creating a new party, etc. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Guide to Searching and Entering Parties. (jr)
Related: [-]