New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Referred: Stewart D Aaron
Case #: 1:20-cv-07572
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2020
Terminated:Mar 08, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Mar 14, 2021 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Prodigy Network, LLC
Defendant
84 William Mezz Newco, Inc.
Defendant
84 William Street Newco, Inc.
Defendant
84 William Street Realty Associates LLC
Defendant
Prodigy Shorewood New York Rep Co.
Defendant
Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC
Represented By
Warren A. Usatine
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, P.A. (nj)
contact info
Nolan Edward Shanahan
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Bradley Philip Pollina
contact info
Plaintiff
Rita Nelly Maria De Paramo Parle
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
International C18 Holdings Ltd.
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ana Maria Mate Londono
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cesar Humberto Medina Garcia
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Manuel Pisa Muntane
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Marie Pascual Par
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Inigo Diego Eugenio Maria Raphael Aspillaga Plenge
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ana Mabel Roa Barrera
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luz Marina Roa Barrera
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Victoria Ruiz De Velasco Martinez De Ercilla
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Timeus Rodas
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gonzalo Jose Vidal Devoto
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jailineli Ltd.
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alapaha View Ltd.
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Paula Arnaldo
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Artesana SA
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nelly Maria Beatriz De Paramo Parle
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Blanca Araceli Botran Santiago
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Amancay Caparros
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alejandro Celentano
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Colle Investments Ltd.
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ecen Del Centro SA De CV
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Felipe Cortes Font
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Barrera Galvis
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ana Lucrecia Garcia Botran
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Miguel Gonzalez-Teja Zachrisson
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dalaman Management Corp.
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pablo Miguel Marantz
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC
Terminated: 10/05/2020


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
119 119 order Judgment - Default ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 03/08 1:10 PM
CONSENT FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PRODIGY SHOREWOOD INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Joint Stipulation is APPROVED and incorporated herein with the same force and effect as if fully set forth herein, and that Defendant Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC shall comply with all of the undertakings and agreements set forth therein. 2. Defendant Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC consents to entry of this Final Default Judgment in connection with Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 77). Defendant Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC also consents to the Court's jurisdiction over it and the subject matter of this action. Furthermore, Defendant Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC waives any entry of findings of fact and/or conclusions of law, and also waives any right to appeal from this Final Default Judgment. 3. Judgment is hereby entered against Defendant Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC and in favor of each of the following Plaintiffs in the below listed amounts, for which let execution issue forthwith: i. Alapaha View Ltd. for $2,000,000.00; ii. Dalaman Management Corp. for $1,098,803.00; iii. Jailineli Ltd. for $676,533.00; iv. Ecen del Centro SA de CV for $250,000.00; v. Colle Investments Ltd. for $999,400.00; vi. International C18 Holdings Ltd. for $634,401.50; vii. Artesana SA for $308,098.00; viii. Miguel Gonzalez-Teja Zachrisson for $50,000.00; ix. Pablo Miguel Marantz for $100,000.00; x. Gonzalo Jose Vidal Devoto and Maria Amancay Caparros for $56,256.40; xi. Maria Victoria Ruiz de Velasco Martinez de Ercilla for $289,921.95; xii. Blanca Araceli Botran Santiago for $500,000.00; xiii. Ana Lucrecia Garcia Botran for $100,000.00; xiv. Manuel Pisa Muntane and Christine Marie Pascual Par for $76,916.21; xv. Ana Mabel Roa Barrera, Luz Marina Roa Barrera, and Gloria Barrera Galvis for $190,000.00; xvi. Alejandro Celentano for $100,000.00; xvii. Juan Carlos Timeus Rodas for $50,000.00; xviii. Iigo Diego Eugenio Maria Raphael Aspillaga Plenge and Nelly Maria Beatriz de Paramo Parle for $219,760.60; xix. Nelly Maria Beatriz de Paramo Parle and Rita Nelly Maria de Paramo Parle for $219,760.60; xx. Maria Paula Arnaldo for $100,000.00; xxi. Cesar Humberto Medina Garcia and Ana Maria Mate Londono for $100,000.00; and xxii. Felipe Cortes Font for $250,000.00. 4. The above judgment amounts shall bear interest at the post-judgment interest rate prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961 and shall be enforceable as prescribed by, inter alia, Rule 69(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 5. The above judgment amounts and this Judgment itself shall equate to a claim submitted by Plaintiffs for the above judgment amounts in the Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC assignment for the benefit of creditors case currently pending in the Supreme Court of New York, New York County. 6. For purposes of this Judgment, Plaintiffs' collective address is c/o Sallah Astarita & Cox, LLC, 3010 North Military Trail, Suite 210, Boca Raton, Florida 33431. 7. The Court reserves jurisdiction to enter further Orders that are proper or for any other necessary purposes for enforcing this Judgment or contemplated by this Judgment, unless the Court directs otherwise. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. Prodigy Shorewood Investment Management LLC (a Delaware limited liability company) terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/8/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
118 118 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/07 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Joint Stipulation for Consent Judgment. Document filed by Alapaha View Ltd., Maria Paula Arnaldo, Artesana SA, Nelly Maria Beatriz De Paramo Parle, Blanca Araceli Botran Santiago, Maria Amancay Caparros, Alejandro Celentano, Colle Investments Ltd., Dalaman Management Corp., Ecen Del Centro SA De CV, Felipe Cortes Font, Gloria Barrera Galvis, Ana Lucrecia Garcia Botran, Miguel Gonzalez-Teja Zachrisson, International C18 Holdings Ltd., Jailineli Ltd., Pablo Miguel Marantz, Rita Nelly Maria De Paramo Parle, Ana Maria Mate Londono, Cesar Humberto Medina Garcia, Manuel Pisa Muntane, Christine Marie Pascual Par, Inigo Diego Eugenio Maria Raphael Aspillaga Plenge, Ana Mabel Roa Barrera, Luz Marina Roa Barrera, Maria Victoria Ruiz De Velasco Martinez De Ercilla, Juan Carlos Timeus Rodas, Gonzalo Jose Vidal Devoto..(Astarita, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Judgment