Luis Pino v. Cardone Capital, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-08499 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2020 |
Re-opened: | May 11, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 15, 2021 1:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Grant Cardone
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardone Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardone Equity Fund V, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardone Equity Fund VI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Dinesh Desai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Pino
|
Represented By
|
1. | Grant Cardone Beats Federal Lawsuit (therealdeal.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/26/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
141 | 141
![]() NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-3512 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,140 as to plaintiff Christine Pino. (mat) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
140 | 140
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Lead Plaintiff Christine Pino. Appeal of Judgment,139 . (Appeal Fee - $505.00 Previously Paid on 11/08/2023, Receipt No. 36374735.)(Seltzer, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |