New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Crotty
Case #: 1:20-cv-07628
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 16, 2021 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Adam P. Rogas
Represented By
Thomas Charles Hill
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
William Michael Sullivan, Jr.
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman Llp (dc)
contact info
Intervenor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
1 St. Andrew's Plaza
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Jared P Lenow
Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Gregory Alan Kasper
Securites And Exchange Commission
contact info
Polly Arlene Atkinson
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission(co)
contact info
Relief Defendant
MVP 2020, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Charles Hill
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
William Michael Sullivan, Jr.
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman Llp (dc)
contact info
Relief Defendant
NS8 FP, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Charles Hill
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
William Michael Sullivan, Jr.
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman Llp (dc)
contact info
Relief Defendant
Rogassi Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Charles Hill
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
William Michael Sullivan, Jr.
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman Llp (dc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/29/2022 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 27, 2022
64 64 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 06/27 3:30 PM
ORDER: granting63 Motion to Amend/Correct63 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct62 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief17 Order on Motion for TRO. THIS MATTER, having come before the Court through the parties' Joint Motion to Modify the Court's Asset Freeze Order, it is hereby: ORDERED that the Court's asset freeze order (Doc. No. 17) ("Asset Freeze Order") is hereby modified to list the following property under Section II: VistaMar #23 Casa De Campo, La Romana 22000, Dominican Republic; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Asset Freeze Orders shall remain in effect in all other respects. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/27/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
63 63 motion Amend/Correct Wed 06/22 10:30 AM
JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct62 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,17 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Heinke, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order