Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 2:20-bk-20299
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Terminated:Oct 20, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Mar 05, 2021

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Energy Fishing & Rental Services, Inc.
PO Box 6406
Corpus Christi, TX 78466-6406
Represented By
Davor Rukavina
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Monday, December 06, 2021
223 223 misc Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Mon 12/06 10:46 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 10/20/2021 (Filed By Energy Fishing & Rental Services Inc. ). (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
222 222 misc Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Mon 12/06 10:45 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 9/30/2021 (Filed By Energy Fishing & Rental Services Inc. ). (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]