Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12822

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:20-ap-00304
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brandon E. Resnick, Defendant
2001 North Ocean Blvd Apt. 905
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33305
Represented By
Brandon E. Resnick
contact info
Defendant
Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC, Defendant
7483 Valencia Drive
Boca Raton, FL 33433
Represented By
Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Exoticar Detailing, LLC, Defendant
7483 Valencia Drive
Boca Raton, FL 33433
Represented By
Exoticar Detailing, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zvi Guttman, Plaintiff
Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. 100 Light Street
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Emily Devan
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, April 16, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/16 8:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-304 Closed. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/15 5:26 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/06 9:58 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC, Exoticar Detailing, LLC, Brandon E. Resnick. (Nesson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set Fri 11/06 2:59 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 8 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Brandon E. Resnick, Defendant Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC, Defendant Exoticar Detailing, LLC
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
7 7 apmisc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 10/28 12:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on behalf of Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC, Exoticar Detailing, LLC, Brandon E. Resnick Filed by Jeffrey P. Nesson. (Nesson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
6 6 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Mon 10/05 2:32 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC 9/28/2020; Exoticar Detailing, LLC 9/28/2020; Brandon E. Resnick 9/28/2020. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP Hearing (Auto-Docket) Mon 10/05 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Pretrial Conference
Friday, October 02, 2020
4 4 court Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 10/02 1:48 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference to Change Time of Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Sunday, September 27, 2020
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Mon 09/28 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, September 25, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 09/25 10:34 AM
Summons Issued on Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC Date Issued 9/25/2020, Answer Due 10/26/2020; Exoticar Detailing, LLC Date Issued 9/25/2020, Answer Due 10/26/2020; Brandon E. Resnick Date Issued 9/25/2020, Answer Due 10/26/2020 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 02:30 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Friday, September 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Fri 09/18 11:35 AM
Adversary case 20-00304 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint by Emily Devan on behalf of Zvi Guttman against Brandon E. Resnick, Atlantic Medical and Legal Staffing Plus, LLC, Exoticar Detailing, LLC. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit