California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:20-cv-08570
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Re-opened:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 17, 2021 2:28 AM PDT
Defendant
George A. Fernandez
Defendant
Judith Fernandez-Adelugba
Represented By
Anthony M Solis
Anthony M Solis Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Alex Wilkerson
Defendant
Alicia Wilkerson
Defendant
Business Solutions Services, Inc.
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Honda Performance Development, Inc.
Represented By
Grace Chen
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Mary H Chu
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Robert L Meylan
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Grace C Lee
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
49 49 judgmentCV Judgment Wed 07/03 3:44 PM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION by Judge John F. Walter. The plaintiff Honda Racing Corporation USA-formerly known as Honda Performance Development, Inc. shall recover from the defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba the amount of One Million Seven Hundred Forty Five Thousand and Nine Hundred Sixty Four Dollars ($1,745,964.00). (iv)
Related: [-]
48 48 5 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 3:40 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT46 by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
47 47 notice Notice of Lodging Tue 07/02 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Judgment46(Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment
46 46 stip Judgment Tue 07/02 2:28 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc..(Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Judgment
Friday, June 21, 2024
45 45 order Extension of Time to File Fri 06/21 8:37 PM
ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT UNTIL JULY 2, 202444 by Judge John F. Walter. The parties shall have until July 2, 2024 to complete their settlement agreement and submit a proposed joint stipulation and final judgment to the Court. (iv)
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 06/21 3:01 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File EXTEND THE COURT'S JURISDICTION to Enforce Settlement filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.. (Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert L. Meylan,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
43 43 textonly Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail Wed 06/12 10:33 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice (Other)41 e-mailed to mchu@mdjalaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 Recipient address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
42 42 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/07 3:55 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. In the Notice of Settlement filed on June 6, 202441 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before June 21, 2024. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until June 21, 2024. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/06 4:49 PM
Notice of Completion Statement and Notice of Tentative Settlement filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.. (Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
40 40 order Extension of Time to File Mon 05/06 2:58 PM
ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ADR PROCEDURE FROM MAY 6, 2024 UNTIL JUNE 6, 202439 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to Extend the deadline to complete the ADR procedure from May 6, 2024 to June 6, 2024 Mediation Completion date is granted. The parties shall have until June 6, 2024 to complete the ADR procedure and file a Notice of Completion. All other dates set forth in the Court's November 3, 2024 Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. (rolm)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 05/06 8:20 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File for Extending the ADR Completion Deadline from May 6, 2024 to June 6, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.. (Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, November 03, 2023
38 38 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 11/03 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2024 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/13/2024 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/24/2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Fri 11/03 4:46 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on November 6, 2023 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby orders this case referred to: ADR Procedure No. 3: Private mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: May 6, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
36 36 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 11/02 11:16 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc... (Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
35 35 order Set Aside Fri 10/27 4:50 PM
ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL34 by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to Set Aside Involuntary Dismissal is GRANTED and the parties shall file and serve a Joint Rule 26(f) Report in this action by or before November 3, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
34 34 motion Set Aside Thu 10/26 4:47 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Aside Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminated Case,33 filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.. (Lee, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert L. Meylan,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 23, 2023
33 33 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/25 8:44 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John F. Walter. As a result of the parties' failure to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as required by the Court's Order of September 29, 2023, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Scheduling Conference, currently on calendar for November 6, 2023, is VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
32 32 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 10/02 5:48 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER LIFTING THE STAY OF THIS ACTION AND SETTING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to the Status Report [docket no. 31] filed on September 29, 2023, the Court lifts the stay in this action. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 6, 2023 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 20, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Status Report Fri 09/29 10:15 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba. (Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 09/22 3:39 PM
TEXT ENTRY ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel shall file a joint status report regarding the status of this action on or before September 29, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
29 29 order Stay Case Mon 01/04 3:33 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION BY DEFENDANTS JUDITH FERNANDEZ-ADELUGBA, GEORGE FERNANDEZ, AND BUSINESS SOLUTION SERVICES, INC. [filed 12/10/2020; Docket No.20 ] by Judge John F. Walter. For the reasons stated in the Moving Defendants' moving and reply papers, the Court GRANTS the Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay. This action is stayed as to Defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez, and Business Solution Services, Inc. pending disposition of the criminal proceedings. (iv)
Related: [-]
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 01/04 1:17 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 12/31 2:58 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. 20 filed by Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba. (Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
26 26 misc For Judicial Notice Wed 12/23 12:20 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. 20 (opposition thereto) filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc.. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
25 25 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/23 12:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. 20 filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc..(Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Robert L. Meylan In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Motion To Stay Litigation
Thursday, December 10, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 12/10 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. 20(Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 misc Supplement Thu 12/10 11:04 AM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. 20 filed by Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba. (Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 12/10 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Stay Case20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Exhibit to Motion Thu 12/10 6:17 AM
EXHIBIT A to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. 20 filed by Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba.(Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit A - Indictment
20 20 motion Stay Case Thu 12/10 6:10 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. filed by defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Statement Thu 12/10 5:44 AM
STATEMENT Joint Statement Regarding Local Rule 7-3 Further to Defendants Motion for Order Staying Litigation filed by Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba (Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 12/04 10:59 AM
Text Entry Order: The Motion to Stay Litigation by Defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc., A (dissolved) California Corporation filed on December 3, 2020 (Docket No.17 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
17 17 motion Stay Case Thu 12/03 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending The Resolution of the Pending Criminal Case as to defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solution Services, Inc. filed by defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Indictment
16 16 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 12/03 5:02 PM
ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING14 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, George Fernandez and Business Solutions Services, Inc. shall file a pleading responsive to plaintiffs complaint on or before December 3, 2020. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/02 4:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc., upon Defendant Business Solutions Services, Inc. served on 11/27/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leslie Fernandez an officer of Business Solutions authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
14 14 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/25 3:53 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba.(Attorney Anthony M Solis added to party Judith Fernandez-Adelugba(pty:dft))(Solis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/04 1:24 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc., upon Defendant George A. Fernandez served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/04 1:19 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc., upon Defendant Judith Fernandez-Adelugba served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 10/30 10:55 AM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc., upon Defendant Alicia Wilkerson served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 10/30 10:52 AM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Honda Performance Development, Inc., upon Defendant Alex Wilkerson served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 10/01 1:30 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
8 8 cs_rasgn Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (CV-29) Wed 09/30 12:20 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 19-03. ORDER case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08570 JFW(MAAx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt and Judge John F. Walter. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
7 7 81 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 09/21 3:55 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (gga)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/18 3:53 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendants George A. Fernandez, Judith Fernandez-Adelugba, Alex Wilkerson, Alicia Wilkerson. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 09/18 3:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 09/18 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 09/18 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance, identifying American Honda Motor Co., Inc.; Honda Motor Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 09/18 2:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance. (Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/18 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28151614 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Honda Performance. (Attorney Grace Chen added to party Honda Performance(pty:pla))(Chen, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet