Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Robert W Pratt
Referred: Helen C Adams
Case #: 4:20-cv-00288
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Terminated:Sep 21, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 17, 2021 3:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Cord King, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew P. Pappas
Pappas Wright PC
contact info
Christopher R. Henson
Pappas Wright PC
contact info
Interested Party
Boyle Built Enterprises
Represented By
Daniela Erickson
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Interested Party
Western National Insurance Company
Represented By
Daniela Erickson
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Metcalf
Represented By
Samuel E. Jones
Shuttleworth & Ingersoll P.L.C.
contact info
Kevin J. Caster
Shuttleworth & Ingersoll P.L.C.
contact info
Kevin J Caster
Shuttleworth & Ingersoll P.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Metcalf
Represented By
Samuel E. Jones
Shuttleworth & Ingersoll P.L.C.
contact info
Kevin J. Caster
Shuttleworth & Ingersoll P.L.C.
contact info
Kevin J Caster
Shuttleworth & Ingersoll P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/21 11:54 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (btg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
45 45 misc Stipulation Tue 09/20 8:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cord King, Inc.. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
44 44 misc Sealed Document Fri 06/10 10:28 AM
Sealed Document: Correspondence re: 6/13/2022 status conference. (jsa)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 06/10 10:26 AM
TEXT ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE. As discussed via email, the parties report they have no matters to discuss with the Court and are on track to meet their deadlines. As such, the 6/13/2022 status conference is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/10/2022. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
42 42 misc Sealed Document Wed 04/20 11:44 AM
Sealed Document : Correspondence re: 4/22/2022 status conference. (jsa)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 04/20 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE. As discussed via email, the parties report they have no matters to discuss with the Court and are on track to meet their deadlines. As such the 4/22/2022 status conference is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/20/2022. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
40 40 misc Sealed Document Fri 02/18 9:41 AM
Sealed Document: Correspondence re: 2/22/22 status conference. (jsa)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order Fri 02/18 9:36 AM
TEXT ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE. As discussed via email, the parties have no matters to discuss with the Court and are on track to meet their deadlines. As such the status conference set for 2/22/2022 is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/18/2022. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
38 38 misc Designation of Expert Witnesses Fri 02/11 4:37 PM
Designation of Expert Witnesses by Cord King, Inc.. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
37 37 order Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines Thu 12/16 10:46 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time of R16/Scheduling Order Deadlines. The Court finds good cause to extend the following deadlines: Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/11/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 4/15/2022. All other deadlines remain as previously set. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/16/2021. (jsa)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines Thu 12/16 10:43 AM
ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines. At 12/16/21 Status Conference Defendants requested an extension of the Expert Witness Disclosure deadline. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (jsa)
Related: [-]
35 35 minutes Status Conference Thu 12/16 10:23 AM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/16/2021. Attorney Kevin Caster appeared for Plaintiffs. Attorney Madison Noelle Wynes appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 6 minutes. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
34 34 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/12 3:08 PM
TEXT ORDER granting33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Madison N. Wynes. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/12/2021. (btg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
33 33 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Tue 11/09 4:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4651677 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Cord King, Inc.. (Wynes, Madison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
32 32 misc Sealed Document Wed 10/13 2:44 PM
Sealed Document- Correspondence Re: 10/15/2021 status conference. (jsa)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order Wed 10/13 2:43 PM
TEXT ORDER CANCELING OCTOBER STATUS CONFERENCE. As discussed via email, the parties have no issues to discuss with the Court and are on track to meet deadlines. As such the 10/15/2021 status conference is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/13/2021. (jsa)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Status Report Wed 10/13 10:25 AM
STATUS REPORT by Cord King, Inc.. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
29 29 order Withdraw as Attorney Thu 09/02 3:11 PM
TEXT ORDER Granting28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk may terminate the appearance of Ms. Erickson. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/2/2021. (jsa)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 09/02 2:32 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Boyle Built Enterprises, Western National Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 9/16/2021. (Erickson, Daniela)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/02 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. Tice on behalf of Boyle Built Enterprises, Western National Insurance Company (Tice, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
26 26 misc Designation of Expert Witnesses Wed 09/01 2:23 PM
Designation of Expert Witnesses by Adam Metcalf, Erin Metcalf. (Caster, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
25 25 minutes Status Conference Mon 08/23 9:50 AM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/23/2021. Attorneys Kevin J. Caster and Samuel E. Jones appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Christopher R. Henson appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Total Court Time: 12 minutes. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 08/20 10:46 AM
STATUS REPORT by Cord King, Inc.. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 08/19 4:41 PM
STATUS REPORT by Adam Metcalf, Erin Metcalf. (Caster, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
22 22 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 06/14 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing18 &19 status reports, the Court has advised Defendant to file a Rule 45 Motion to Compel regarding the non-party subpoenas. As there were no other issues to be discussed, the Status Conference set for 6/16/2021 is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/14/2021. (bam)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Mon 06/14 3:04 PM
STATUS REPORT re: June 16, 2021 Status Conference by Adam Metcalf, Erin Metcalf. (Jones, Samuel)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 06/14 2:53 PM
STATUS REPORT by Cord King, Inc.. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
19 19 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/22 11:32 AM
ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/22/2021. (bam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Fillable Order,
Att: 2 Supplement JERS Instructions
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/22 11:30 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Telephonic Status Conferences set for: 6/16/2021 09:30 AM; 8/23/2021 09:30 AM; 10/15/2021 09:30 AM; 12/16/2021 09:30 AM; 2/22/2022 09:30 AM; 4/22/2022 09:30 AM, 6/13/2022 09:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/22/2021. (bam)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Mon 02/22 11:23 AM
ORDER Adopting15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 4/15/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/2/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/1/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/1/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/3/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 3/1/2022. Discovery Deadline 6/1/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2022 09:30 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt. Estimated trial length of 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/22/2021. (bam)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 02/22 11:13 AM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/22/2021. Attorneys Kevin J. Caster and Samuel E. Jones appeared for Plaintiffs. Attorney Christopher R. Henson appeared for Defendant. The Interested Parties were not represented. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (bam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
15 15 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Wed 02/10 4:52 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Jones, Samuel)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice - Other Wed 02/10 1:11 PM
NOTICE by Boyle Built Enterprises, Western National Insurance Company Notice of WC Lien (Erickson, Daniela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
13 13 order ~Util - Set Hearings Order Tue 01/19 5:28 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan pursuant to L.R. 16 by 2/15/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/19/2021. (bam)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Tue 01/19 4:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Cord King, Inc.. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/19 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Cord King, Inc..(Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/15 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Cord King, Inc..(Pappas, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement
Monday, December 28, 2020
9 9 order Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/28 4:31 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant may have until 1/15/2021 to file a responsive pleading to1 Complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/28/2020. (bam)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/28 3:07 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Cord King, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/22 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Henson on behalf of All Defendants (Henson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
6 6 order Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/03 3:55 PM
TEXT ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant may have until 12/30/2020 to file a responsive pleading to1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/3/2020. (bam)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/03 2:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Cord King, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Pappas, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/03 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Pappas on behalf of All Defendants (Pappas, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/23 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Metcalf, Adam Metcalf. Cord King, Inc. served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Jones, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
2 2 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Mon 09/21 2:57 PM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, September 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/18 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Cord King, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4250929., filed by Erin Metcalf, Adam Metcalf, E. M., W. M., O. M.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/17/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/17/2020.(Jones, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons