Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Bastian
Case #: 2:20-cv-00336
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Terminated:Feb 10, 2023
Case in other court:Spokane County Superior Court, 20-00002-02253-32
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 17, 2021 1:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Cathi Harris
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Defendant
Jim Riley
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Defendant
Renee Schuiteman
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Defendant
Kristopher Smith
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Defendant
Megan Smith
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Defendant
State of Washington
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Defendant
Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By
Nicholas R Ulrich
Attorney General Of Washington - Spo
contact info
Plaintiff
Troy Bruner
Represented By
Court A Hall
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Michael A Maurer
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Courtney A. Hall
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Burke D Jackowich
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Charles Hausberg
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonia Tombari
Represented By
Court A Hall
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Michael A Maurer
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Courtney A. Hall
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Burke D Jackowich
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info
Charles Hausberg
Lukins & Annis Ps - Spo
contact info

GPO Jun 10 2021
ORDER DENYING 13 JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CLP, Case Administrator)
GPO Nov 30 2021
THIRD AMENDED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Granting 28 Motion to Continue; Dismissing as Moot 39 Motion for Protective Order. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2022 is STRICKEN and RESET to 10/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755; Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 is STRICKEN and RESET to 11/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CLP, Case Administrator)
GPO Feb 10 2023
ORDER GRANTING 58 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Court remands Plaintiff's state law claims back to Spokane County Superior Court. File is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
GPO Feb 10 2023
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE in favor of State of Washington, Washington State Department of Corrections, Cathi Harris, Jim Riley, Kristopher Smith, Megan Smith and Renee Schuiteman against Antonia Tombari and Troy Bruner. (TNC, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 10, 2023
75 75 1 pgs order Judgment - Clerk Fri 02/10 12:28 PM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE in favor of State of Washington, Washington State Department of Corrections, Cathi Harris, Jim Riley, Kristopher Smith, Megan Smith and Renee Schuiteman against Antonia Tombari and Troy Bruner. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
74 74 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 02/10 12:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING58 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Court remands Plaintiff's state law claims back to Spokane County Superior Court. File is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
73 73 2 pgs minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/07 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2023 re58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kristopher Smith, Cathi Harris, Jim Riley, Washington State Department of Corrections, Megan Smith, Renee Schuiteman, State of Washington. Related [+] (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Kimberly Allen