New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Donald H Steckroth
Case #: 2:11-bk-17984
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2011
Converted:Feb 19, 2013
Terminated:Jul 22, 2014

Debtor
Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC
120 48Th St # 152
Union City, NJ 07087-6439
Represented By
Daniel Santiago
Law Offices Of Emilio Santiago, LLC
contact info
Tomas Espinosa
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert B. Wasserman
Wasserman, Jurista & Stolz 225 Millburn Avenue, Suite 207 PO Box 1029
Millburn, NJ 07041
Represented By
Robert B. Wasserman
Wasserman, Jurista & Stolz
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee One Newark Center Suite 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Donald F. MacMaster
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/09/2013 6:49 PM EST
Thursday, March 17, 2011
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-17984 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt number 20837762, amount $ 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Tomas Espinosa on behalf of Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC. Atty Disclosure Statement due 03/31/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/31/2011. Summary of schedules due 03/31/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 03/31/2011.Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 09/13/2011. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 01/11/2012.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 04/7/2011 (Espinosa, Tomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Missing Documents. Related [+]. Missing Documents: Schedules A B D E F G and H, Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, Corporate Resolution, List of Equity Security Holders and Most Recent Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations and Tax Return. Incomplete Filings due by 3/31/2011. (blh)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Hudson River Radiology Center, LLC