Garrett Turbo Ltd
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-12212
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-12212
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-12247 |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Garrett Turbo Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, July 30, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
order
Motion, Approve
Fri 07/30 3:56 PM
Order signed on 7/26/2021 consolidating the administration of all outstanding claims and miscellaneous matters under Garrett Motion Inc., entering a final decree closing certain chapter 11 cases and granting related relief . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 07/30 6:24 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Maria) |
||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 07/21 11:48 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 20-12247 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending 06/30/2021 for Garrett Turbo Ltd Filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Application, Final Decree
Wed 07/14 5:39 PM
Application for Final Decree / , Motion to Approve /Notice of Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Consolidating the Administration of All Outstanding Claims and Miscellaneous Matters Under Garrett Motion Inc., (II) Entering a Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases and (III) Granting Related Relief. (Administrative Entry was Entered to Reflect the Accurate Docket Event Code) filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Ho, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules
Tue 01/05 12:38 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for Garrett Turbo Ltd Filed by Andrew G. Dietderich on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Dietderich, Andrew) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 01/04 10:29 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Statement of Financial Affairs for Garrett Turbo Ltd` Filed by Andrew G. Dietderich on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Dietderich, Andrew) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Fri 09/25 1:04 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent, added to the case. (Ho, Amanda) |
||
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 09/21 8:11 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Waiving Requirements of Section 342(c)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002(n) filed by Andrew G. Dietderich on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Dietderich, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 09/21 3:30 PM
Order signed on 9/21/2020 directing joint administration of related chapter 11 cases 20-12211 thru 20-12247 under 20-12212 (Garrett Motion, Inc., et al.) as the lead case . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Mon 09/21 8:32 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Lewis, Tenille) |
||
misc
Case Flags
Mon 09/21 5:02 PM
Joint Administration Case Flag Added. (Bush, Brent) |
||
Sunday, September 20, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 09/21 1:29 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Waiving Requirements of Section 342(c)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002(n) (Administrative Entry was Entered to Reflect the Accurate Docket Event Code ((See Case No. 20-12212 (MEW) Garrett Motion Inc. doc #2.)) filed by Andrew G. Dietderich on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Ho, Amanda) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 09/20 9:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Brian D. Glueckstein of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP on behalf of Garrett Turbo Ltd. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sun 09/20 9:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-12247 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14344568. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |