D'AMBLY v. EXOO et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jamel K Semper |
Referred: | Joseph A Dickson |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-12880 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Apr 30, 2025 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 22, 2021 12:00 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
TWITTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
NEW YORK DAILY NEWS
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
VIJAYA GADDE
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CHRISTIAN EXOO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNNAMED ASSOCIATES 1 100
|
|
Defendant
TWITTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NEW YORK DAILY NEWS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VIJAYA GADDE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHRISTIAN EXOO
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV BRIAN MEAD
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ADAM MASTROLEO
|
|
Notice Only
PHV JOSEPH MULHERIN
|
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW REIDINGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL D'AMBLY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AARON WOLKIND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK ANTHONY TUCCI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAN-MICHAEL DAVID SCOTT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD SCHWETZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ZACHARY REHL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMANDA REHL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS LOUDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN HUGO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN HARTLEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOBEL BARBOSA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
qc
QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff
Thu 05/01 3:47 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Court only entry filed above by the Clerk's office on April 30, 2025 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (sms) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 05/01 3:57 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (sms) |