Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:20-cv-05938
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2020
Terminated:Nov 30, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 20, 2021 3:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Kalama Export Company LLC
Represented By
April Hook
Mcgrath North Mullin & Kratz
contact info
Steven Case
Mcgrath North Mullin & Kratz
contact info
Veronica M Keithley
Stoel Rives (wa)
contact info
Beth S Ginsberg
Stoel Rives (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Columbia Riverkeeper
Represented By
Simone Anter
Columbia Riverkeeper
contact info
Richard Adam Smith
Smith & Lowney PLLC
contact info
Alyssa Lee Englebrecht
Smith & Lowney PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 29, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Thu 12/29 2:45 PM
ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO TERMINATE CONSENT DECREE (Doc No.23 ). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Terminate Consent Decree is granted. The Consent Decree previously entered in this matter (Doc No.22 ) is terminated as well as the Court's jurisdiction over the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
23 23 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 12/27 2:02 PM
Joint Stipulated MOTION to Terminate Consent Decree , filed by Defendant Kalama Export Company LLC. Noting Date 12/27/2022, (Keithley, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
22 22 order Decree Tue 11/30 3:11 PM
CONSENT DECREE signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. This Consent Decree is a full and complete settlement and release of all of the claims in the complaint and the sixty-day notice, and all other claims existing as of the date of entry of this Consent Decree that could have been asserted by Riverkeeper under the Clean Water Act, 33 U.S.C. § 1251 et seq., against KEC or its officers, directors, employees, members, shareholders, successors, assigns, or agents arising from or relating to the operation of the Facility. These claims are released and dismissed with prejudice. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
21 21 misc Statement Fri 11/19 6:56 AM
STATEMENT re19 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree No Objection by United States by Plaintiff Columbia Riverkeeper (Smith, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
20 20 misc Praecipe-Other Mon 10/04 12:02 PM
PRAECIPE re19 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree by Plaintiff Columbia Riverkeeper(Smith, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 10/04 11:51 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree , filed by Plaintiff Columbia Riverkeeper. Noting Date 11/26/2021, (Smith, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 letter to docket clerk
Friday, April 30, 2021
18 18 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 04/30 10:52 AM
ORDER granting Stipulated17 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
17 17 motion Protective Order Thu 04/29 2:17 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant Kalama Export Company LLC. Noting Date 4/29/2021, (Hook, April)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
16 16 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Tue 02/02 8:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *SEVEN DAY* Bench Trial is set for 4/5/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/4/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/27/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 10/27/2021, Motions due by 11/8/2021, Discovery completed by 12/6/2021, Dispositive motions due by 1/5/2022, Motions in Limine due by 2/28/2022, Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/15/2022, Deposition Designations due by 3/15/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom E. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
15 15 10 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 01/13 8:14 AM
ORDER AND AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION re14 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
14 14 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 01/07 4:39 PM
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and [Proposed] Order , filed by Defendant Kalama Export Company LLC. Noting Date 1/7/2021, (Keithley, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
13 13 misc Joint Status Report Mon 12/28 1:23 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (Englebrecht, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
12 12 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/23 2:29 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven Case for defendant Kalama Export Company LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/23 2:24 PM
ORDER re8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney April Hook for defendant Kalama Export Company LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/20 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Veronica M Keithley on behalf of Defendant Kalama Export Company LLC. (Keithley, Veronica)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/20 3:31 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven P. Case FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Kalama Export Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6754300 (Ginsberg, Beth)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/20 3:29 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY April N. Hook FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Kalama Export Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6754258 (Ginsberg, Beth)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/20 3:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Archer Daniels Midland Company, Other Affiliate Kalama Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Agrex, Inc. for Kalama Export Company LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kalama Export Company LLC (Ginsberg, Beth)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/20 3:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Attorney Beth S Ginsberg added to party Kalama Export Company LLC(pty:dft) by Kalama Export Company LLC.(Ginsberg, Beth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
5 5 service Waiver of Service Fri 10/02 1:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Kalama Export Company LLC mailed on 9/21/2020 (Englebrecht, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
4 4 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Mon 09/28 4:12 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/22 10:42 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kalama Export Company LLC. (ERA)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/22 8:42 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper (Englebrecht, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/22 10:36 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/21 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kalama Export Company, LLC Related [+], filed by Columbia Riverkeeper.(Englebrecht, Alyssa)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-6610852
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons