New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Referred: Robert W Lehrburger
Case #: 1:20-cv-07772
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2020
Terminated:Jul 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 20, 2021 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Needham & Company, LLC
Represented By
Brian Stryker Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
1 Bryant Park
New York, NY 10036
Defendant
Stella Xu
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Webster
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
M.D. Tim Shannon
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Michael Richman
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By
Brian Stryker Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
NextCure, Inc.
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
BTIG, LLC
Represented By
Brian Stryker Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
M.D. Briggs Morrison
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By
Brian Stryker Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Judith J. Li
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Chau Q. Khuong
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Ph.D. David Kabakoff
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Ph.D. Elaine V. Jones
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
M.D. Kevin N. Heller
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Steven P. Cobourn
Represented By
Bruce G. Vanyo
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christina Lucen Costley
Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp (los Angeles)
contact info
Thomas Michael Artaki
Katten Muchin Rosenman, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
BofA Securities, Inc.
Represented By
Brian Stryker Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ye Zhou
Represented By
Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( Nyc)
contact info
Rhiana Lauren Swartz
Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( Nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, July 13, 2023
55 55 1 pgs order Judgment - Clerk Thu 07/13 10:13 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:54 Memorandum Opinion & Order. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion & Order dated July 12, 2023, Defendants' motion to dismiss Amended Complaint is GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/13/2023) (nd) (Main Document 55 replaced on 7/13/2023) (nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Notice of Right to Appeal
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
54 54 29 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 07/12 3:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re:39 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . filed by Kevin N. Heller, Steven P. Cobourn, NextCure, Inc., Stephen Webster, Tim Shannon, David Kabakoff, Briggs Morrison, Judith J. Li, Chau Q. Khuong, Michael Richman, Stella Xu, Elaine V. Jones. For the foregoing reason, Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint is granted. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 40. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment accordingly and close case no. 20-cv-7772. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/12/23) (yv)
Related: [-]