Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12822

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:20-ap-00308
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alexis Resnick
2001 North Ocean Blvd., Apt. 905
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33305
Represented By
Alexis Resnick
contact info
Plaintiff
Zvi Guttman
Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. 100 Light Street
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Emily Devan
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/05 1:26 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-308 Closed. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/04 11:40 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
court Hearing Set Fri 11/13 8:13 AM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Alexis Resnick
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/10 9:36 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Alexis Resnick. (Heyman, William)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Mon 11/09 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 11/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Friday, November 06, 2020
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/06 8:59 AM
Order Granting Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Joe M. Grant as Attorney for Defendant Alexis Resnick Filed by Joe M Grant.
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
8 8 crditcrd none Tue 11/03 4:19 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice 20-00308 [motion,mprohcad] ( 100.00). Receipt number 37621592. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 11/03 4:15 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Joe M. Grant as Attorney for Defendant Alexis Resnick Filed by Joe M Grant. (Heyman, William) Modified on 11/4/2020 (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
6 6 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Mon 10/05 2:33 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Alexis Resnick 9/28/2020. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP Hearing (Auto-Docket) Mon 10/05 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Pretrial Conference
Friday, October 02, 2020
4 4 court Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 10/02 1:45 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference to Change Time of Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Sunday, September 27, 2020
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Mon 09/28 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, September 25, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 09/25 10:37 AM
Summons Issued on Alexis Resnick Date Issued 9/25/2020, Answer Due 10/26/2020 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 02:30 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Tue 09/22 2:25 PM
Adversary case 20-00308 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint by Emily Devan on behalf of Zvi Guttman against Alexis Resnick. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A