Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-06659
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2020
Case in other court:New York Western, 1:20-cv-01196
Last checked: Monday Mar 22, 2021 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Chrisman
Represented By
Brian Alan Goldstein
Cellino Law LLP
contact info
Brian A. Goldstein
Cellino & Barnes, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 16, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/16 1:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 11/16 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 11/16 1:26 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/26 11:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Margaret Chrisman. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Goldstein, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 09/23 2:57 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-01196. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Wed 09/23 3:00 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Western, 1 20-1196 Chrisman v Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-6659 WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-234 cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
3 3 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 9/21/2020. (MD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
Related: [-]
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(JD)
Related: [-]
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
2 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 09/03/2020 by Margaret Chrisman. Waiver of Service due by 11/3/2020. (Goldstein, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-50, Monsanto Company $ 400 receipt number 0209-3962339, filed by Margaret Chrisman.(Goldstein, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet