Bak v. Lancaster Central School District
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Arcara |
Referred: | Leslie G Foschio |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00400 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | May 28, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 2:36 PM EST |
Defendant
Lancaster Central School District
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Randolph C. Oppenheimer
|
|
Plaintiff
Deborah A. Bak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Text Order
Tue 07/14 9:34 AM
TEXT ORDER: Upon notice of settlement from counsel for the plaintiff, the Clerk shall terminate the action subject to the parties having the right, for 14 days, to enter a valid stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 7/14/15. (LAS) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/13 8:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Notice of Dismissal by Deborah A. Bak. (Korn, Lindy) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/08 1:44 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 7/1/2015. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/15/2015. Discovery completed by 8/14/2015. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 9/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2015. Mediation To End by 11/16/2015.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/8/2015. (SDW) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Text Order
Wed 06/03 3:56 PM
TEXT ORDER GRANTING parties' request18 for extension of time to complete discovery. Second Amended Scheduling Order shall be filed separately. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/3/2015. (SDW) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Declaration
Wed 06/03 2:20 PM
DECLARATION filed by Lancaster Central School District Enclosed Letter to Judge Foschio .(Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Brendan P. Kelleher, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
adr
Mediation Certification
Mon 04/06 11:38 AM
Mediation Certification by Randolph C. Oppenheimer(Oppenheimer, Randolph) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/03 8:39 AM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 5/1/2015. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 5/15/2015. Discovery completed by 6/15/2015. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 7/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2015. Mediation To End by 9/17/2015.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/2/2015. (SDW) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/02 3:33 PM
DECLARATION filed by Lancaster Central School District Letter to Judge Foschio with enclosures .(Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration of Brendan P. Kelleher, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 11/25 11:44 AM
TEXT ORDER approving Stipulation13 -- First Mediation Session due by 12/31/2014. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/25/2014. (SDW) |
|
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Mon 11/17 11:49 AM
STIPULATION /Motion to Extend Date for Initial Mediation Session by Lancaster Central School District. (Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Deborah A. Bak(Korn, Lindy) | |
Thursday, September 11, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Mandatory Disclosures due by 9/19/2014. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 10/10/2014. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2014. First Mediation Session due by 11/25/2014. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 4/1/2015. Discovery completed by 4/15/2015. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 4/15/2015. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 5/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2015. Mediation To End by 7/17/2015.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/11/2014. (SDW) | |
10 | 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2014. Case management order discussed, same to be filed by the court. Appearances: Pltf- Richard Perry, Esq., Dft: Brendan Kelleher, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) | |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling Order by Lancaster Central School District.(Kelleher, Brendan) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 21, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2014 10:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/21/2014. (SDW) | |
Wednesday, July 02, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 7/2/14. (LAS) | |
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (DLC) | ||
Tuesday, July 01, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint by Lancaster Central School District.(Lopardi, Tracie) | |
Tuesday, June 17, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Patrick Kelleher on behalf of Lancaster Central School District (Kelleher, Brendan) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracie L. Lopardi on behalf of Lancaster Central School District (Lopardi, Tracie) | |
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Lancaster Central School District. (DLC) | |
2 | 2 Notice of Right to Consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge form. (Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening.) (DLC) | |
Case Assigned to Hon. Richard J. Arcara. (DLC) | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (DLC) | ||
Wednesday, May 28, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Lancaster Central School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2039366.), filed by Deborah A. Bak.(Korn, Lindy) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |