Original Case: 4:18-cv-02150

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-02975
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 04, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2022 3:32 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
United States
Represented By
Bonnie I. Robin-Vergeer
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Anna Marks Baldwin
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Tovah Calderon
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City of St. Louis, State of Missouri
Represented By
Korey Lewis
CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE
contact info
Alexis Lee Silsbe
CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE
contact info
Sheena Hamilton
CITY OF ST. LOUIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Michael A. Deeba, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By
Korey Lewis
CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE
contact info
Alexis Lee Silsbe
CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE
contact info
Sheena Hamilton
CITY OF ST. LOUIS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow
Represented By
Megen Ilene Hoffman
RICK BARRY LAW OFFICES, PC
contact info
Richard Andrew Barry III
RICK BARRY LAW OFFICES, PC
contact info

GPO Apr 04 2022
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Bobby E. Shepherd and David R. Stras
AUTHORING JUDGE:Bobby E. Shepherd (PUBLISHED) [5143248] [20-2975]

Docket last updated: 04/05/2022 3:32 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4958599] 20-2975 (AEV)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 9/11/20, Judgment 9/11/20, docket entries, [4958609] 20-2975 (AEV)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 11/02/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow due 11/02/2020.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[4958610] 20-2975 (AEV)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Rick Barry for Appellant Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow w/service 09/23/2020 [4958630] 20-2975 (RAB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Alexis Silsbe for Appellees City of St. Louis and Michael A. Deeba w/service 09/23/2020 [4958642] 20-2975 (ALS)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Korey Lewis for Appellees City of St. Louis and Michael A. Deeba w/service 09/23/2020 [4958744] 20-2975 (KL)
Related: [-]