Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 2:20-cr-00074
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Sep 26, 2020 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Christopher Parrish (1)
Represented By
Bonita L Gunden-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Cristy J McElroy-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Eric Scott Coats-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joshua Jerome Frausto-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Sean Jeffrey Taylor-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Meredith Elizabeth Pinkham-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office - Criminal Amarillo
contact info
Anna Marie Bell-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Nov 02 2020
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Christopher Parrish. Re: 24 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 11/2/2020) (chmb)
GPO Nov 18 2020
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION CONCERNING PLEA OF GUILTY Re: 27 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Christopher Parrish. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 11/18/2020) (nhp)

Docket last updated: 09/26/2020 3:28 AM CDT
Friday, August 14, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Christopher Parrish (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance filed by USA as to Christopher Parrish. (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
4 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Christopher Parrish: Initial Appearance set for 8/19/2020 02:15 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/19/2020) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Initial Appearance as to Christopher Parrish held on 8/19/2020. Date of Arrest: 8/19/2020. Deft first appearance. Deft advised of rights/charge. Deft appeared without counsel. Deft requested appointed counsel. Financial affidavit executed. Counsel appointed. Deft remanded to custody. Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Meredith Elizabeth Pinkham-DOJ; Defense - None. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:12. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Christopher Parrish. (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Christopher Parrish. Bonita L Gunden-FPD, Cristy J McElroy-FPD, Eric Scott Coats-FPD for Christopher Parrish appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/19/2020) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER ON INITIAL APPEARANCE AND SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION AND DETENTION HEARING as to Christopher Parrish: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 8/21/2020 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/19/2020) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
9 9 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing as to Christopher Parrish continued on 8/21/2020. Deft requested continuance. Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Anna Marie Bell - DOJ; Defense - Bonita L. Gunden-FPD. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER ON PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION AND DETENTION HEARING as to Christopher Parrish: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing continued and RESET for 8/26/2020 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. Parties are instructed to review Special Order 13-15 (www.txnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/documents/SO13-15.pdf). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/21/2020) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bonita L Gunden-FPD (Clerk to Set Designation as: Federal Public Defender Appointment) appearing for Christopher Parrish (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Counsel is served with a copy of the[LINK:General Order Regarding the Use of Interpreters in Criminal Cases Filed in the Amarillo Division.] Clerk to mail a copy to any attorney who does not receive electronic notice of this entry.) (Gunden-FPD, Bonita) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
12 12 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Preliminary Examination as to Christopher Parrish waived in open court on 8/26/2020. Detention Hearing as to Christopher Parrish held on 8/26/2020. Argument and proffers heard. Court grants government's motion for pretrial detention. Deft remanded to custody. Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Anna Marie Bell - DOJ; Defense - Bonita L. Gunden-FPD. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER ON PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION AND DETENTION HEARING as to Christopher Parrish: At the hearing, the defendant waived the Preliminary Examination, and this case is Ordered bound over for presentation to the Grand Jury. After consideration of the proffers presented at the hearing, the Court finds the defendant is a flight risk and a danger to the community. The government's Motion for Pretrial Detention is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/26/2020) (chmb) [2:20-mj-00116-BR]
Related: [-]