New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:20-cv-13516
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2020
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 28, 2021 5:04 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
MADISON AVENUE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP, P.C.
Represented By
CHARLES C. KOERNIG
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
DR. FREDERICK STINNER, D.C.
Represented By
CHARLES C. KOERNIG
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
JUSTIN BRUTOSKY
Represented By
LAURA ANN WALKER
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
SUZANA BRUTOSKY
Represented By
LAURA ANN WALKER
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MADISON AVENUE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP, P.C.
95 MADISON AVENUE 4TH FLOOR
MORRISTOWN, NJ 07960
Represented By
CHARLES C. KOERNIG
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
Defendant
DR. FREDERICK STINNER, D.C.
95 MADISON AVENUE 4TH FLOOR
MORRISTOWN, NJ 07960
Represented By
CHARLES C. KOERNIG
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
SUZANA BRUTOSKY
Represented By
LAURA ANN WALKER
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN BRUTOSKY
Represented By
LAURA ANN WALKER
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info
H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Law Office Of Leon Aussprung, Md, LLC
contact info

GPO Oct 03 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/3/2023. (qa, )

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 05, 2024
98 98 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Fri 04/05 10:16 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/5/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
97 97 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 04/04 3:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FREDERICK STINNER, D.C.. (KOERNIG, CHARLES)
Related: [-]