New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Margo K Brodie
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:20-cv-04636
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2020
Terminated:May 25, 2022
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 8:20-cv-01101
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 23, 2021 4:27 AM EDT
Consol Plaintiff
Pawnee Leasing Corporation
Represented By
William Albert McBride
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,
contact info
Robert A. Solove
Solove & Solove, P.A.
contact info
Amy Lea Drushal
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,
contact info
Defendant
MMP Capital, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Marc Emanuel
Ronald M. Emanuel, PA
contact info
Frank Peretore
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Lisa M. McQuade
Chiesa, Shahinian & Giantomasi, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
201 Old Country Road Suite 120
Melville, NY 11747
Plaintiff
Francis J. Averill, M.D.
Represented By
Jeffrey B. Fabian
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
C. Phillip Campbell, Jr.
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick
contact info
Peter Ray Silverman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Charles P. Campbell, Jr.
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey B. Fabian
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
C. Phillip Campbell, Jr.
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick
contact info
Peter Ray Silverman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Charles P. Campbell, Jr.
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
St. Francis LLC
Terminated: 06/12/2020
Represented By
Jeffrey B. Fabian
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Matthew Agojo Ceriale
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Charles P. Campbell, Jr.
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2022
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 103 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File. The Court grants Defendant's motion as to Plaintiffs FDUTPA and civil conspiracy claims and denies the motion as to Plaintiffs fraudulent inducement and rescission claims. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a second amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiffs fraudulent inducement and rescission claims may proceed to discovery. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/31/2022. (Okonta, Patricia)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/25 10:32 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (Piper, Francine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
114 114 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/24 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Francis J. Averill, M.D., St. Francis Holdings, LLC and MMP Capital, Inc. (STIPULATED VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) (Campbell, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
order Scheduling Order Thu 05/19 9:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re113 Letter filed by Francis J. Averill, M.D., St. Francis Holdings, LLC: The deadline by which to submit a joint status letter and a proposed discovery schedule is extended to May 25, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/19/2022. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
113 113 misc Letter Wed 05/18 2:50 PM
Letter to The Honorable Judge Margo K. Brodie by Francis J. Averill, M.D., St. Francis Holdings, LLC (Campbell, C.)
Related: [-]