Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:20-cv-01466
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2020
Terminated:Aug 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 28, 2021 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
REPUBLIC STEEL
Represented By
Seth J Linnick
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Julie A. Callsen
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DEEMAC SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Thomas E. Sanchez
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Daniel B. McLane
Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott
contact info

GPO May 20 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 05/20/21. (eca)
GPO Jan 25 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by REPUBLIC STEEL and 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DEEMAC SERVICES, LLC. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/25/23. (eca)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
146 146 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Tue 10/17 10:05 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: trial exhibits. Neither party having contacted the Court, all trial exhibits will be destroyed this day, 10/17/23. (eca)
Related: [-]