Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Rose
Case #: 3:20-cv-00406
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Mar 11, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 30, 2021 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
US Attorney General William Barr
U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
USCIS Dist. N12 Dir. Anna Chau
USCIS District N12 Director 1240 East Ninth Street Room 501
Cleveland, OH 44199
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
Snr. Off. USCIS Kenneth T Cuccinelli
USCIS 111 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20008
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
USCIS Cin.F.Off. Dir Julie Decker
USCIS Cincinnati Field Office Director JW Peck Federal Building 550 Main Street Room 4001
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
Director, USCIS PSC John L. Lafferty
USCIS Potomac Service Center 2200 Potomac Center Drive Stop 2425
Arlington, VA 20598
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
US Citizenship and Immigration Services
USCIS 111 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20008
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
Acting Secretary DHS Chad Wolf
Department of Homeland Security 245 Murray Lane SW
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Plaintiff
Farkhod Abdullaev
2278 Millwood Road
Dayton, OH 45440
Represented By
Blake Paul Somers
Blake P. Somers LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Diyora Abidova
2278 Millwood Road
Dayton, OH 45440
Represented By
Blake Paul Somers
Blake P. Somers LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Thursday, March 11, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/11 12:55 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. Per8 . (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/10 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Farkhod Abdullaev, Diyora Abidova (Somers, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 02/23 4:39 PM
STATUS REPORT (first, joint) by Plaintiffs Farkhod Abdullaev, Diyora Abidova. (Somers, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 12/29 10:57 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting6 Joint Motion to Stay -The parties are ordered to file a Status Report on February 26, 2021, and approximately every 60 days thereafter, until such time as this matter may be ultimately resolved, whether by voluntary dismissal or resolution on the pleadings and/or merits. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12 29-2020 (de)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/29 10:59 AM
NOTATION ORDER finding as moot5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer due to the filing of the notation order docketed 12/29/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12 29-2020 (de)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 12/29 11:53 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/26/2021. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
6 6 motion Stay Mon 12/28 2:38 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiffs Farkhod Abdullaev, Diyora Abidova. (Somers, Blake)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/28 2:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,4 Stipulation New date requested 1/27/2021. by Defendants William Barr, Anna Chau, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, John L. Lafferty, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (King, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
4 4 misc Stipulation Mon 12/07 3:00 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER TO DECEMBER 28, 2020 by Defendants William Barr, Anna Chau, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, John L. Lafferty, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (King, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/20 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendants William Barr, Anna Chau, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, John L. Lafferty, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf (King, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 10/02 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to William Barr, Anna Chau, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, John L. Lafferty, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kma)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 10/02 8:43 AM
Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT against William Barr, Anna Chau, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, John L. Lafferty, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7684249), filed by Farkhod Abdullaev, Diyora Abidova. (Somers, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Birth Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit I-94,
Att: 3 Exhibit Decision on I-751,
Att: 4 Exhibit NTA,
Att: 5 Exhibit I-130 packet,
Att: 6 Exhibit I-130 receipt,
Att: 7 Exhibit Letter of 010818,
Att: 8 Exhibit Letter of 092818,
Att: 9 Exhibit Letter of 101019,
Att: 10 Exhibit Letter of 112619,
Att: 11 Exhibit Letter of 112619 to Potomac,
Att: 12 Exhibit Letter of 021517 to DHS,
Att: 13 Exhibit email to uscis,
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 15 Summons Form Summons to Barr,
Att: 16 Summons Form Summons to Wolf,
Att: 17 Summons Form Summons to USCIS,
Att: 18 Summons Form Summons to Cuccinelli,
Att: 19 Summons Form Summons to Lafferty,
Att: 20 Summons Form Summons to Chau,
Att: 21 Summons Form Summons to Decker