Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03091
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevin J Dunne, an individual
22 Ranch Road
Orinda, CA 94563
Represented By
Kevin J Dunne
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Friday, December 11, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/11 4:02 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3091. (ds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/03 10:09 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Plaintiff's Dismissal of Party
9 9 notice Notice of Plaintiffs Dismissal of Party Thu 12/03 10:08 AM
Notice of Plaintiff's Dismissal of Party in Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice . Kevin J Dunne Terminated. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 11/23 8:53 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 11/22/20.(bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Sunday, November 22, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Sun 11/22 9:04 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on December 10, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed its record and finds that service of process is proper and that, pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(3) and FRBP 7015, Defendant's answer or other initial responsive pleading was due no later than November 2, 2020. Defendant has not answered or otherwise responded to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: (1) The scheduling conference is hereby continued to February 18, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The continued scheduling conference will convene by telephone. Please refer to the court's website for information concerning the status of court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic and for information concerning how to arrange to appear at a telephonic hearing. If you have questions, you may contact the court by calling 888-821-7606 or by using the Live Chat feature on the courts website. (2) No later than December 4, 2020, Plaintiff shall file and serve a request for entry of default, pursuant to FRCP 55(a) and FRBP 7055. (3) No later than 30 days following entry of a Clerks Default pursuant to Paragraph (2) of this order, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment, pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2) and FRBP 7055. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, October 16, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/16 10:51 AM
Certificate of Service of First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 15, 2020
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/15 2:41 PM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against Kevin J Dunne. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 12:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kevin J Dunne 10/6/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/02 9:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Discovery Order
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Wed 09/30 4:19 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (ka)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 09/30 4:18 PM
Summons Issued on Kevin J Dunne Answer Due 10/30/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (ka)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 cmp Adversary Cover Sheet Wed 09/30 1:12 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet re Adversary Complaint Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/30 1:11 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03091 . 11 Related [+], 13, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Kevin J Dunne. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other