Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03114
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Dec 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
James D Wangelin, an individual
638 S. Lincoln
Hinsdale, IL 60521
Represented By
James D Wangelin
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Monday, December 07, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/07 11:58 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3114. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/04 3:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(I)] and Notice of Settlement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/04 3:08 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Settlement Case Management Action due after 12/18/2020. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/23 10:07 AM
Certificate of Service of First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/23 10:05 AM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against James D Wangelin. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 3:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on James D Wangelin 10/6/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Thu 10/01 2:21 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lb)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 2:20 PM
Summons Issued on James D Wangelin Answer Due 11/2/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/14/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 cmp Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 10/01 12:07 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet re Adversary Complaint Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 12:06 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03114 . 13 Related [+], 11, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against James D Wangelin. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other