Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Matthew W Brann
Case #: 4:20-cv-01794
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Jul 26, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 30, 2021 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Guthrie Clinic, Ltd
Represented By
Peter J. Hoffman
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Francis Greek
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Michael J. O'Brien
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital
Represented By
Peter J. Hoffman
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Francis Greek
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Michael J. O'Brien
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Arvinder, MD Uppal
Represented By
John J. Pollock
Levene Gouldin & Thompson, Ll
contact info
Plaintiff
Luke Sansouci
Represented By
Christina M Sonsire
Ziff Law Firm
contact info
Michael H. Collins
Mcnerney, Page, Vanderlin & Hall
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelby Sansouci
Represented By
Christina M Sonsire
Ziff Law Firm
contact info
Michael H. Collins
Mcnerney, Page, Vanderlin & Hall
contact info
Plaintiff
Brad Yackel
Represented By
Christina M Sonsire
Ziff Law Firm
contact info
Michael H. Collins
Mcnerney, Page, Vanderlin & Hall
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Yackel
Represented By
Christina M Sonsire
Ziff Law Firm
contact info
Michael H. Collins
Mcnerney, Page, Vanderlin & Hall
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology
Terminated: 11/13/2020
Represented By
Peter J. Hoffman
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Francis Greek
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Michael J. O'Brien
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Monday, July 26, 2021
36 36 misc Sealed Document (pdf only) Mon 07/26 3:25 PM
DOCUMENT SEALED - Infant Compromise Order as to Shelby Sansouci. Signed by Matthew W. Brann on 7/26/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Sealed Document (pdf only) Mon 07/26 3:23 PM
DOCUMENT SEALED - Infant Compromise Order as to Rebecca and Brad Yackel. Signed by Matthew W. Brann on 7/26/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Mon 07/26 2:39 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/26/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Document(s) Pending Sealing Decision Mon 07/26 12:51 PM
Petition by Shelby Sansouci (jr) (SEE DOC #34 - ORDER APPROVING.) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplemental Affidavit of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Attorney's Declaration,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Luke Sansouci,
Att: 4 Trust,
Att: 5 Broker's Affidavit,
Att: 6 Guardian's Report,
Att: 7 Attorney Affirmation,
Att: 8 Proposed Order,
Att: 9 Declaration in Support
31 31 misc Document(s) Pending Sealing Decision Mon 07/26 12:44 PM
Petition by Rebecca and Brad Yackel (jr) (SEE DOC #34 - ORDER APPROVING.) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney's Declaration,
Att: 2 Trust,
Att: 3 Broker's Affidavit,
Att: 4 Guardian's Report,
Att: 5 Attorney Affirmation,
Att: 6 Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Declaration in Support
30 30 motion File Document Under Seal (Court Use Only) Mon 07/26 12:33 PM
JOINT MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Luke Sansouci, Shelby Sansouci, Brad Yackel and Rebecca Yackel.(jr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 09, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Sever Fri 07/09 2:08 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that26 Joint Motion to Sever is granted. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/9/2021. (lg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
26 26 motion Sever Wed 06/30 12:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims by Rebecca Yackel.(Sonsire, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 29, 2021
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/29 2:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/29/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
22 22 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Fri 02/12 10:37 AM
ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK: Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 2/1/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 3/1/2022. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Memos due by 10/13/2022. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 10/31/2022 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on December 2022 trial term. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/11/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
20 20 misc Case Management Plan Thu 02/04 2:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Rebecca Yackel. (Sonsire, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 01/25 3:17 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses - with dated Certificate of Service by Arvinder, MD Uppal.(Pollock, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/12 6:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 2/11/2021 at 3:30 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/12/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/12 12:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Arvinder, MD Uppal.(Pollock, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/12 9:25 AM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital.(Hoffman, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Thu 01/07 5:11 PM
Order approving13 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Paragraphs 41 and 46 of the Complaint are stricken. Counts XI XVI of the Complaint are withdrawn without prejudice to reactivate them at the close of discovery. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/7/2021. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
14 14 misc Supplement Mon 01/04 1:55 PM
Supplement by Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital. PROPOSED ORDER . (Hoffman, Peter)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 01/04 9:36 AM
STIPULATION by Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital, Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, filed by Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital, Guthrie Clinic, Ltd.(Hoffman, Peter)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 01/04 1:49 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Hoffman is instructed to file a separate form of order for Judge Brann's signature/approval re Stipulation, using the civil event Other Filings > Other Documents > Supplement; please do not refile the Stipulation. (lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/17 10:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Rebecca Yackel. All Defendants. (Sonsire, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/13 10:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca Yackel.(Sonsire, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
10 10 order Special Admissions Form Approved Wed 10/14 4:35 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Peter Hoffman. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/14/2020. (lg)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Special Admissions Form Approved Wed 10/14 4:34 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Francis Greek. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/14/2020. (lg)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 10/14 2:03 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Francis Greek and Attorney Peter Hoffman and Associate Counsel Michael J. Obrien; Attorney Michael J. O'Brien is generally admitted to this court and is eligible to be listed as associate counsel. (lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
8 8 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/13 12:55 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Peter J. Hoffman on behalf of Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital Attorney Peter J. Hoffman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5294831.. (Hoffman, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/13 12:53 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Francis Greek on behalf of Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital Attorney Francis J. Greek is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5294799.. (Greek, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Tue 10/06 4:51 PM
Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/6/2020. (jr)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Special Admissions Form Approved Tue 10/06 11:08 AM
SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Christina Sonsire. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/6/2020. (lg)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Supplement Tue 10/06 10:22 AM
Supplement by Rebecca Yackel. to3 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice,,, . (Sonsire, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/05 9:07 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Sonsire is reminded to file a SUPPLEMENT to the petition for special admission, particularly, JUST page 3, listing the name and contact information of associate counsel; please do not refile the petition or another fee will be charged. (lg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
3 3 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/02 10:18 AM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christina M Sonsire on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Christina Sonsire is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5280577., Petition Special Admission , filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Sonsire, Christina)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 10/02 10:44 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Sonsire is instructed to file a SUPPLEMENT to the petition for special admission, particularly, JUST page 3, listing the name and contact information of associate counsel; please do not refile the petition or another fee will be charged. (lg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/01 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital, Arvinder, MD Uppal ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5278927), filed by Rebecca Yackel, Brad Yackel, Luke Sansouci, Shelby Sansouci.(nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet