New York Eastern District Court
Judge:William F Kuntz, II
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:20-cv-04698
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2020
Terminated:Feb 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
John Melnick, M.D.
Represented By
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Defendant
John Vernon Crues, M.D.
Represented By
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Defendant
Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C.
Represented By
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Defendant
Radnet Management, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Defendant
Radnet, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Richard D. King, Jr.
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
Smith & Brink P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Richard D. King, Jr.
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
Smith & Brink P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By
Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Richard D. King, Jr.
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
Smith & Brink P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Richard D. King, Jr.
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
Smith & Brink P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
77 77 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 03/02 9:48 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to72 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Vernon Crues, M.D., Radnet, Inc., John Melnick, M.D., Radnet Management, Inc., Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C. The parties in the above- referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Issued as Mandate: 3/2/2022. USCA# 21-2433 (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
76 76 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/28 4:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Stipulation of Dismissal75 has been granted. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/28/2022. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
75 75 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/28 1:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to All Defendants by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]